This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 07:05:24 (UTC).

MILLER VS MILLER

Case Summary

On 09/26/2006 MILLER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MILLER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0409

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICA MILLER TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT

AMERICA MILLER

Defendants

JODIE PAYNE

SEA VIEW FINANCIAL CENTER

STEPHEN LEE MARGOLIN

ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY

JOSEPH ANTHONY VELTRE

AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY

JOSIE ORTIZ

CARL LINDROS

GAIL M RICH

MORTGAGE COMPANY OF SANTA BARBARA

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMP

HOWARD L RICH

MARVIN LEE MILLER

ALLIED CORPORATE INVESTMENT

CATHERINE PERRY

CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY FORECLOSURE DEPA

CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY

CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY FORECLOSURE DEPARTMENT

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY P. PEABODY

Defendant Attorneys

BOSS LAW FIRM

BUFFINGTON LAW FIRM PC

GREENWALD & HOFFMAN LLP

BROWNSTEIN HYATT FARBER SCHRECK LLP

RUTAN & TUCKER

Other Attorneys

MARVIN LEE MILLER

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10134947 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 159313.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10134947 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 159313.

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS (AND COMPLAINT) FILED BY ORTIZ, JOSIE ON 06/11/2008

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS (AND COMPLAINT) FILED BY ORTIZ, JOSIE ON 06/11/2008

ORDER SHORTENING TIME FILED BY RICH, HOWARD L ON 05/16/2008

ORDER SHORTENING TIME FILED BY RICH, HOWARD L ON 05/16/2008

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY RICH, HOWARD L; RICH, GAIL M ON 05/30/2008

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY RICH, HOWARD L; RICH, GAIL M ON 05/30/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 14.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10122881 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 147247.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 14.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10122881 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 147247.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS 05/13/2008 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS 05/13/2008 02:00:00 PM.

DECLARATION - OTHER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL) FILED BY RICH, HOWARD L; RICH, GAIL M ON 05/09/2008

DECLARATION - OTHER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL) FILED BY RICH, HOWARD L; RICH, GAIL M ON 05/09/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE (BY FAX) FILED BY LINDROS, CARL; MORTGAGE COMPANY OF SANTA BARBARA ON 05/08/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE (BY FAX) FILED BY LINDROS, CARL; MORTGAGE COMPANY OF SANTA BARBARA ON 05/08/2008

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (HAND DELIVERY) FILED BY LINDROS, CARL; MORTGAGE COMPANY OF SANTA BARBARA ON 05/08/2008

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (HAND DELIVERY) FILED BY LINDROS, CARL; MORTGAGE COMPANY OF SANTA BARBARA ON 05/08/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10098067 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 122434.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10098067 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 122434.

NOTICE - OTHER (OF OSC RE DISMISSALS) FILED BY RICH, HOWARD L; RICH, GAIL M ON 04/16/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF OSC RE DISMISSALS) FILED BY RICH, HOWARD L; RICH, GAIL M ON 04/16/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MILLER, MARVIN LEE ON 03/24/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MILLER, MARVIN LEE ON 03/24/2008

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MILLER, MARVIN LEE ON 03/21/2008

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MILLER, MARVIN LEE ON 03/21/2008

RESPONSE FILED BY MILLER, AMERICA ON 03/28/2008

RESPONSE FILED BY MILLER, AMERICA ON 03/28/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10057001 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 81408.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10057001 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 81408.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS; NOTICE TO CONSUMER OR EMPLOYEE AND OBJECTION) FILED BY MILLER, AMERICA ON 01/25/2008

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS; NOTICE TO CONSUMER OR EMPLOYEE AND OBJECTION) FILED BY MILLER, AMERICA ON 01/25/2008

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY RICH, HOWARD L; RICH, GAIL M ON 01/10/2008

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY RICH, HOWARD L; RICH, GAIL M ON 01/10/2008

ORDER GRANTING (EX PARTE APPL. FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME) FILED BY RICH, HOWARD L ON 01/04/2008

ORDER GRANTING (EX PARTE APPL. FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME) FILED BY RICH, HOWARD L ON 01/04/2008

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR TEMPORARY JUDGE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ORTIZ, JOSIE ON 07/28/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS 07/22/2008 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY RICH, HOWARD L; RICH, GAIL M ON 07/18/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/01/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 07/01/2008 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2008
  • THE COURT ORDERS FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY RICH, GAIL M ON 06/20/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL) FILED BY RICH, HOWARD L; RICH, GAIL M ON 06/18/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (OF ERRATA RE HEARING DATE) FILED BY ORTIZ, JOSIE ON 06/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
310 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (MOTION - GRANTED/DENIED) ON 10/16/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2006
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (EX PARTE MOTION/APPLICATION) WAS FILED BY AMERICA MILLER ON 10/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2006
  • MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE (MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE/TRANSFER) WAS FILED BY AMERICA MILLER ON 10/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY AMERICA MILLER ON 10/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY AMERICA MILLER ON 10/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY AMERICA MILLER ON 10/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY AMERICA MILLER ON 09/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY AMERICA MILLER ON 09/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 09/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2006
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (NOTICE OF ACTION PENDING) WAS FILED BY AMERICA MILLER ON 09/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.