This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/22/2016 at 12:25:39 (UTC).

MID-CITY VS STITES

Case Summary

On 07/19/2006 MID-CITY filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against STITES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3079

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MID-CITY INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.

Defendant

VALOR STITES

Assignees

PETER S HWU & ASSOCIATES

PETER S HWU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

PETER S HWU & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MID-CITY INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.; HWU, PETER S ON 05/04/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MID-CITY INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.; HWU, PETER S ON 05/04/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11744255 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11568448.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11744255 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11568448.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 3/02/2015) RECEIVED ON 02/27/2015.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 3/02/2015) RECEIVED ON 02/27/2015.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY HWU, PETER S ON 02/27/2015

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY HWU, PETER S ON 02/27/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PETER S HWU & ASSOCIATES ON 02/13/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PETER S HWU & ASSOCIATES ON 02/13/2015

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY PETER S HWU & ASSOCIATES ON 02/13/2015

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY PETER S HWU & ASSOCIATES ON 02/13/2015

NOTES

NOTES

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4322675 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4322675 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MID-CITY INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.; HWU, PETER S ON 05/04/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1255026 RECEIVED ON 05/04/2015 03:02:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11744255 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11568448.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 3/02/2015) RECEIVED ON 02/27/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY HWU, PETER S ON 02/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4336066 RECEIVED ON 02/27/2015 05:38:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PETER S HWU & ASSOCIATES ON 02/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY PETER S HWU & ASSOCIATES ON 02/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1231179 RECEIVED ON 02/13/2015 04:25:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2007
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT (ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT) WAS FILED ON 03/05/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 02/22/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED ON 10/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2006
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED ON 10/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE - OTHER) WAS FILED BY MID-CITY INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. ON 09/15/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED) WAS FILED ON 07/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF APPLICATION AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 07/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less