Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/22/2016 at 12:22:30 (UTC).

METLIFE VS RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 07/19/2006 METLIFE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3939

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METLIFE AUTO & HOME

Defendants

ANDRES RODRIGUEZ JR

SOCORRO RODRIGUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARNESS, FRED M-LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11334080 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11157972.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11334080 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11157972.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 02/26/2013.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 02/26/2013.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY METLIFE AUTO & HOME ON 02/26/2013

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY METLIFE AUTO & HOME ON 02/26/2013

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY METLIFE AUTO & HOME ON 12/18/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY METLIFE AUTO & HOME ON 12/18/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10081505 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 105872.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10081505 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 105872.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10081502 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 105869.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10081502 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 105869.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 90 - CERTIFICATE OF FACTS REGARDING UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT (DL 30) IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10081172 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 105539.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 90 - CERTIFICATE OF FACTS REGARDING UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT (DL 30) IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10081172 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 105539.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN (INTEREST $727.41) FILED BY METLIFE AUTO & HOME ON 03/20/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN (INTEREST $727.41) FILED BY METLIFE AUTO & HOME ON 03/20/2008

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2013
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11334080 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11157972.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 02/26/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY METLIFE AUTO & HOME ON 02/26/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2214551 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2013 11:46:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2012
  • TRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY METLIFE AUTO & HOME ON 12/18/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10081505 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 105872.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10081502 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 105869.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 90 - CERTIFICATE OF FACTS REGARDING UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT (DL 30) IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10081172 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 105539.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (CONTINUANCE - COURT ORDER) ON 01/23/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) WAS FILED BY METLIFE AUTO & HOME ON 01/11/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY METLIFE AUTO & HOME ON 12/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2006
  • OTHER ACTIONS (REJECTED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 12/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 11/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTED) WAS FILED BY METLIFE AUTO & HOME ON 08/03/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY METLIFE AUTO & HOME ON 08/03/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY METLIFE AUTO & HOME ON 07/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY METLIFE AUTO & HOME ON 07/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 07/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METLIFE AUTO & HOME is a litigant