This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/23/2016 at 02:56:21 (UTC).

MERCURY INSURANCE V HILL

Case Summary

On 07/25/2006 MERCURY INSURANCE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HILL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3230

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

RICHARD HILL

TOMMY R GONZALES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GERTZ & LAURIE

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 10/13/2010 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 10/13/2010 08:30:00 AM.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/13/2010

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/13/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10522643.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10522643.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/30/2010

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/30/2010

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE (RE: ATTORNEY) FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/26/2010

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE (RE: ATTORNEY) FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/26/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10094752 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 119119.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10094752 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 119119.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/14/2008

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/14/2008

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 10/13/2010 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • WARRANT ORDERED AGAINST RICHARD HILL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • BAIL ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF 4,273.78 FOR HILL,RICHARD ON 10/14/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/13/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2010
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 10/13/2010 AT 08:30:00 AM IN LH04 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10522643.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/30/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE (RE: ATTORNEY) FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/26/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2008
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 05/14/2008 AT 08:30:00 AM IN S09 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2006
  • REQUEST - OTHER (REQUEST - OTHER) WAS FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/12/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 11/29/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2006
  • REQUEST - OTHER (REQUEST - OTHER) WAS FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2006
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/O PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/25/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/25/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 07/25/2006

    Read MoreRead Less