This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/29/2016 at 05:19:20 (UTC).

MEINHARD VS SZYMANSKI

Case Summary

On 01/27/2006 MEINHARD filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SZYMANSKI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2622

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAMES CRAIG MEINHARD TRUSTEE OF TRUST

JAMES CRAIG MEINHARD TRUSTEE OF TRUST B MEINHARD FAM TRST

Defendants and Intervenors

JASON T SZYMANSKI

JAMES CRAIG MEINHARD, TRUSTEE OF TRUST

ED INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS LP

FRANK PARRA

CNL COMMERCIAL FINANCE INC

BORREGO SPRINGS BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIAT

BORREGO SPRINGS BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Intervenors

ED INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS LP

FRANK PARRA

JASON T SZYMANKSI

Cross Defendants

ESTATE OF LEE BROSHEARS

WIL DROUIN

DROUIN REALTY INC

WILFRED DROUIN

VIRGINIA MEINHARD

VIRGINIA LANGE

JAMES CRAIG MEINHARD, TRUSTEE OF TRUST B OF THE MEINHARD FAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MARK STEVEN KESSLER

MEARS AND GARCIA

C. RANDALL COOK

MANNING & MARDER KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ LLP

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

C. RANDALL COOK

PATRICK B. CONKEY-LAW OFFICES OF

KRING AND CHUNG

Defendant, Intervenor and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

PATRICK B. CONKEY-LAW OFFICES OF

KRING AND CHUNG

WAYNE FONG

MICHAEL GILLIGAN

 

Court Documents

RETURN TO SENDER - LAW OFFICES OF MARK S KESSLER

RETURN TO SENDER - LAW OFFICES OF MARK S KESSLER

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL GENERATED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/02/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/02/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 05/05/2008 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 05/05/2008 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 03/19/2008 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 03/19/2008 08:45:00 AM.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/28/2008

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/28/2008

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY JAMES CRAIG MEINHARD TRUSTEE OF TRUST B MEINHARD FAMILY TRUS ON 02/06/2008

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY JAMES CRAIG MEINHARD TRUSTEE OF TRUST B MEINHARD FAMILY TRUS ON 02/06/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ED INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS LP ON 02/27/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ED INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS LP ON 02/27/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ED INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS LP ON 02/14/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ED INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS LP ON 02/14/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY PARRA, FRANK REJECTED ON 02/07/2008.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY PARRA, FRANK REJECTED ON 02/07/2008.

JUDGMENT (ON COMPLAINT) FILED BY JAMES CRAIG MEINHARD TRUSTEE OF TRUST B MEINHARD FAM TRST ON 02/06/2008

JUDGMENT (ON COMPLAINT) FILED BY JAMES CRAIG MEINHARD TRUSTEE OF TRUST B MEINHARD FAM TRST ON 02/06/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 02/06/2008 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 02/06/2008 08:45:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY PARRA, FRANK REJECTED ON 01/31/2008.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY PARRA, FRANK REJECTED ON 01/31/2008.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY ED INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS LP REJECTED ON 01/30/2008.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY ED INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS LP REJECTED ON 01/30/2008.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10040636 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 65049.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10040636 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 65049.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 01/08/2008 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 01/08/2008 08:45:00 AM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY JAMES CRAIG MEINHARD TRUSTEE OF TRUST B MEINHARD FAM TRST ON 01/07/2008

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY JAMES CRAIG MEINHARD TRUSTEE OF TRUST B MEINHARD FAM TRST ON 01/07/2008

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN TO SENDER - LAW OFFICES OF MARK S KESSLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY ED INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS LP ON 05/09/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL NOT DELIVERABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRECTED ORDER: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 05/05/2008 08:45:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER DATED 05/05/2008 CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/02/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
178 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY JASON T SZYMANSKI ON 02/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2006
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES) WAS FILED BY JASON T SZYMANSKI ON 02/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2006
  • MOTION - OTHER (MOTION EXPUNGE LES PENDENS) WAS FILED BY JASON T SZYMANSKI ON 02/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTED) WAS FILED BY JAMES CRAIG MEINHARD TRUSTEE OF TRUST B MEINHARD FAM TRST ON 02/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY JAMES CRAIG MEINHARD TRUSTEE OF TRUST B MEINHARD FAM TRST ON 02/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2006
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (NOTICE OF ACTION PENDING/LIS PENDENS) WAS FILED BY JAMES CRAIG MEINHARD TRUSTEE OF TRUST B MEINHARD FAM TRST ON 02/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2006
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (NOTICE OF ACTION PENDING/LIS PENDENS) WAS FILED BY JAMES CRAIG MEINHARD TRUSTEE OF TRUST B MEINHARD FAM TRST ON 02/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY JAMES CRAIG MEINHARD TRUSTEE OF TRUST B MEINHARD FAM TRST ON 01/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY JAMES CRAIG MEINHARD TRUSTEE OF TRUST B MEINHARD FAM TRST ON 01/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 01/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less