This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/15/2016 at 02:30:20 (UTC).

MCT GROUP VS ARMSTRONG

Case Summary

On 03/09/2006 MCT GROUP filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against ARMSTRONG. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1274

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCT GROUP

Defendant

JAMES M ARMSTRONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SUSNOW, ROBERT L: LAW OFFICES OF

MCT GROUP, INC.

MORRIS LAW, P.C.

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12022327 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11846352.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12022327 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11846352.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 08/18/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 08/18/2016

WRIT (ISSUED 8/30/16) RECEIVED ON 08/18/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 8/30/16) RECEIVED ON 08/18/2016.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 08/10/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 08/10/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 12/04/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 12/04/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11875975 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11700154.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11875975 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11700154.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 11/09/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 11/09/2015

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 11/10/15) RECEIVED ON 11/09/2015.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 11/10/15) RECEIVED ON 11/09/2015.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 11/09/2015

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 11/09/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 09/15/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 09/15/2015

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 10/23/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 10/23/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10423558 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10247432.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10423558 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10247432.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 07/13/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 07/13/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 12/15/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 12/15/2008

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12022327 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11846352.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 08/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 8/30/16) RECEIVED ON 08/18/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2486915 RECEIVED ON 08/18/2016 03:38:42 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 08/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2484659 RECEIVED ON 08/10/2016 02:12:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 12/04/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4472928 RECEIVED ON 12/04/2015 04:27:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11875975 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11700154.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 11/09/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED ON 07/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2006
  • WRIT ISSUED ON 07/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED ON 07/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED ON 07/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2006
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED (WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED) WAS FILED BY MCT GROUP ON 04/11/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED ON 03/16/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED ON 03/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED) WAS FILED ON 03/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 03/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF APPLICATION AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less