This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/24/2016 at 03:45:47 (UTC).

MATTHEWS VS GARRETT

Case Summary

On 08/21/2006 MATTHEWS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARRETT. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3584

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATT MATTHEWS

Defendants

DANIEL GARRETT

DOUGLAS GARRETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BLOCK, DENNIS P. & ASSOCIATES

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN, LLP

Defendant Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 03/27/2015

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 03/27/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 03/27/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 03/27/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11464584 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11288476.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11464584 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11288476.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 09/05/2013

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 09/05/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 09/05/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 09/05/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 09/05/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 09/05/2013

WRIT (ISSUED 9-21-13) RECEIVED ON 09/05/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED 9-21-13) RECEIVED ON 09/05/2013.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 05/01/2013

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 05/01/2013

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 05/01/2013

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 05/01/2013

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 04/02/2008

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 04/02/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 1.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10080281 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 104648.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 1.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10080281 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 104648.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 03/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 03/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4351715 RECEIVED ON 03/27/2015 07:38:41 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11464584 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11288476.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 09/05/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 09/05/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY MATTHEWS, MATT ON 09/05/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 9-21-13) RECEIVED ON 09/05/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 473272 RECEIVED ON 09/05/2013 01:44:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY MATT MATTHEWS ON 09/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY MATT MATTHEWS ON 09/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 09/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY MATT MATTHEWS ON 09/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY MATT MATTHEWS ON 09/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY MATT MATTHEWS ON 09/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED) WAS FILED ON 08/22/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 08/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY MATT MATTHEWS ON 08/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 08/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.