This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/05/2017 at 02:19:56 (UTC).

MARINA LIMON VS. GARDEN GROVE AGENCY FOR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

Case Summary

On 08/10/2009 MARINA LIMON filed an Other lawsuit against GARDEN GROVE AGENCY FOR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ELIDIA GONZALEZ

JOSE SANCHEZ

JAVIER IBARRA

CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY REFORM NOW, ORANGE COUNTY CHAPTER

MARIA MALTA

RANDOLPH MAYNOR

ELIZABETH BOCANEGRA

SAUL RAMERIEZ

THE KENNEDY COMMISSION

ANA ROSA OLEA

IVAN TORRES

ALFREDO CORDERO

CELIA GONZALEZ

RAYMOND KENT CREAMER

Defendants

THE CITY OF GARDEN GROVE, AS SUCCESSOR AGENCY

GARDEN GROVE AGENCY FOR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

THE GARDEN GROVE CITY COUNCIL

THE CITY OF GARDEN GROVE

THE GARDEN GROVE HOUSING AUTHORITY AS SUCCESSOR HOUSING ENTITY

Interested Party

MCWHINNEY REAL ESTATE SERVICES

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PUBLIC COUNSEL LAW CENTER

FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI L L P

CALIFORNIA AFFORDABLE HOUSING LAW PROJECT OF PUBLIC INTEREST

RIOS & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

STRADLING YOCCA CARLSON & RAUTH

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3380330 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3380330 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/05/2014 09:59:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/05/2014 09:59:00 AM.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY LIMON, MARINA; CORDERO, ALFREDO; GONZALEZ, CELIA; MAYNOR, RANDOLPH; SANCHEZ, JOSE; CREAMER, RAYMOND KENT; OLEA, ANA ROSA; GONZALEZ, ELIDIA; TORRES, IVAN; IBARRA, JAVIER;OTHERS ON 10/07/2013

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY LIMON, MARINA; CORDERO, ALFREDO; GONZALEZ, CELIA; MAYNOR, RANDOLPH; SANCHEZ, JOSE; CREAMER, RAYMOND KENT; OLEA, ANA ROSA; GONZALEZ, ELIDIA; TORRES, IVAN; IBARRA, JAVIER;OTHERS ON 10/07/2013

NOTICE - OTHER (OF STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY LIMON, MARINA; CORDERO, ALFREDO; GONZALEZ, CELIA; MAYNOR, RANDOLPH; SANCHEZ, JOSE; RAMERIEZ, SAUL; BOCANEGRA, ELIZABETH; CREAMER, RAYMOND KENT; OLEA, ANA ROSA; MALTA, MARIA;OTHERS ON 03/04/2013

NOTICE - OTHER (OF STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY LIMON, MARINA; CORDERO, ALFREDO; GONZALEZ, CELIA; MAYNOR, RANDOLPH; SANCHEZ, JOSE; RAMERIEZ, SAUL; BOCANEGRA, ELIZABETH; CREAMER, RAYMOND KENT; OLEA, ANA ROSA; MALTA, MARIA;OTHERS ON 03/04/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT, CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT) FILED BY LIMON, MARINA; CORDERO, ALFREDO; GONZALEZ, CELIA; MAYNOR, RANDOLPH; SANCHEZ, JOSE; RAMERIEZ, SAUL; BOCANEGRA, ELIZABETH; CREAMER, RAYMOND KENT; OLEA, ANA ROSA; MALTA, MARIA;OTHERS ON 09/20/2011

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT, CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT) FILED BY LIMON, MARINA; CORDERO, ALFREDO; GONZALEZ, CELIA; MAYNOR, RANDOLPH; SANCHEZ, JOSE; RAMERIEZ, SAUL; BOCANEGRA, ELIZABETH; CREAMER, RAYMOND KENT; OLEA, ANA ROSA; MALTA, MARIA;OTHERS ON 09/20/2011

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO EXPARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND STIPULATED TRO) FILED BY GARDEN GROVE AGENCY FOR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT; THE CITY OF GARDEN GROVE; THE GARDEN GROVE CITY COUNCIL ON 09/09/2011

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO EXPARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND STIPULATED TRO) FILED BY GARDEN GROVE AGENCY FOR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT; THE CITY OF GARDEN GROVE; THE GARDEN GROVE CITY COUNCIL ON 09/09/2011

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 08/24/2011.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 08/24/2011.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 08/24/2011.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 08/24/2011.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/15/2011 01:32:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/15/2011 01:32:00 PM.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF AMADI I. JORDAN-WALKER) FILED BY LIMON, MARINA; CORDERO, ALFREDO; GONZALEZ, CELIA; MAYNOR, RANDOLPH; SANCHEZ, JOSE; RAMERIEZ, SAUL; BOCANEGRA, ELIZABETH; CREAMER, RAYMOND KENT; OLEA, ANA ROSA; MALTA, MARIA;OTHERS ON 08/05/2011

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF AMADI I. JORDAN-WALKER) FILED BY LIMON, MARINA; CORDERO, ALFREDO; GONZALEZ, CELIA; MAYNOR, RANDOLPH; SANCHEZ, JOSE; RAMERIEZ, SAUL; BOCANEGRA, ELIZABETH; CREAMER, RAYMOND KENT; OLEA, ANA ROSA; MALTA, MARIA;OTHERS ON 08/05/2011

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TEMPORAARY RESTRAINING ORDER) FILED BY LIMON, MARINA ON 08/08/2011

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TEMPORAARY RESTRAINING ORDER) FILED BY LIMON, MARINA ON 08/08/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF CELIA GONZALEZ IN SUPPORT) FILED BY LIMON, MARINA ON 07/11/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF CELIA GONZALEZ IN SUPPORT) FILED BY LIMON, MARINA ON 07/11/2011

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE TRIAL DATE AMD RELATED PRE-TRIAL DATE AND RELATED PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY LIMON, MARINA; GARDEN GROVE AGENCY FOR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT ON 02/04/2011

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE TRIAL DATE AMD RELATED PRE-TRIAL DATE AND RELATED PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY LIMON, MARINA; GARDEN GROVE AGENCY FOR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT ON 02/04/2011

REPLY TO OPPOSITION (TO DEMURRER) FILED BY GARDEN GROVE AGENCY FOR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT; THE CITY OF GARDEN GROVE; THE GARDEN GROVE CITY COUNCIL ON 12/10/2010

REPLY TO OPPOSITION (TO DEMURRER) FILED BY GARDEN GROVE AGENCY FOR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT; THE CITY OF GARDEN GROVE; THE GARDEN GROVE CITY COUNCIL ON 12/10/2010

OPPOSITION FILED BY LIMON, MARINA ON 06/25/2010

OPPOSITION FILED BY LIMON, MARINA ON 06/25/2010

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY LIMON, MARINA; GARDEN GROVE AGENCY FOR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT ON 06/22/2010

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY LIMON, MARINA; GARDEN GROVE AGENCY FOR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT ON 06/22/2010

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BOCANEGRA, ELIZABETH; CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY REFORM NOW, ORANGE COUNTY CHAPTER; CORDERO, ALFREDO; CREAMER, RAYMOND KENT; GONZALEZ, CELIA; GONZALEZ, ELIDIA; IBARRA, JAVIER; LIMON, MARINA; MALTA, MARIA; MAYNOR, RANDOLPH;OTHERS ON 12/31/2009

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BOCANEGRA, ELIZABETH; CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY REFORM NOW, ORANGE COUNTY CHAPTER; CORDERO, ALFREDO; CREAMER, RAYMOND KENT; GONZALEZ, CELIA; GONZALEZ, ELIDIA; IBARRA, JAVIER; LIMON, MARINA; MALTA, MARIA; MAYNOR, RANDOLPH;OTHERS ON 12/31/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 133- COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 355.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10443343 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10267217.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 133- COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 355.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10443343 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10267217.

215 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GARDEN GROVE AGENCY FOR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT; THE CITY OF GARDEN GROVE; THE GARDEN GROVE CITY COUNCIL ON 09/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3457715 RECEIVED ON 09/15/2016 11:55:44 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GONZALEZ, ELIDIA; TORRES, IVAN ON 08/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3449578 RECEIVED ON 08/23/2016 05:25:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4528724 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3380330 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 02/25/2015 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • STATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 03/25/2015 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/25/2015 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
408 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/13/2010 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BOCANEGRA, ELIZABETH; CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY REFORM NOW, ORANGE COUNTY CHAPTER; CORDERO, ALFREDO; CREAMER, RAYMOND KENT; GONZALEZ, CELIA; GONZALEZ, ELIDIA; IBARRA, JAVIER; LIMON, MARINA; MALTA, MARIA; MAYNOR, RANDOLPH; OLEA, ANA ROSA; RAMERIEZ, SAUL; SANCHEZ, JOSE; TORRES, IVAN; GARDEN GROVE AGENCY FOR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT; THE CITY OF GARDEN GROVE; THE GARDEN GROVE CITY COUNCIL ON 09/23/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY LIMON, MARINA ON 08/18/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY LIMON, MARINA ON 08/18/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY LIMON, MARINA ON 08/18/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 133- COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 355.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10443343 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10267217.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BOCANEGRA, ELIZABETH; CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY REFORM NOW, ORANGE COUNTY CHAPTER; CORDERO, ALFREDO; CREAMER, RAYMOND KENT; GONZALEZ, CELIA; GONZALEZ, ELIDIA; IBARRA, JAVIER; LIMON, MARINA; MALTA, MARIA; MAYNOR, RANDOLPH; OLEA, ANA ROSA; RAMERIEZ, SAUL; SANCHEZ, JOSE; TORRES, IVAN ON 08/10/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BOCANEGRA, ELIZABETH; CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY REFORM NOW, ORANGE COUNTY CHAPTER; CORDERO, ALFREDO; CREAMER, RAYMOND KENT; GONZALEZ, CELIA; GONZALEZ, ELIDIA; IBARRA, JAVIER; LIMON, MARINA; MALTA, MARIA; MAYNOR, RANDOLPH; OLEA, ANA ROSA; RAMERIEZ, SAUL; SANCHEZ, JOSE; TORRES, IVAN ON 08/10/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SANDERS, GLENDA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY LIMON, MARINA; CORDERO, ALFREDO; GONZALEZ, CELIA; MAYNOR, RANDOLPH; SANCHEZ, JOSE; RAMERIEZ, SAUL; BOCANEGRA, ELIZABETH; CREAMER, RAYMOND KENT; OLEA, ANA ROSA; MALTA, MARIA; GONZALEZ, ELIDIA; TORRES, IVAN; IBARRA, JAVIER; CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY REFORM NOW, ORANGE COUNTY CHAPTER ON 08/10/2009

    Read MoreRead Less