This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/04/2016 at 07:58:41 (UTC).

MANUEL MAGANA VS. KB HOME COASTAL INC

Case Summary

On 12/24/2008 MANUEL MAGANA filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME COASTAL INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2008

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANNE KISON

SOUN HEE PAK

ROMULO RUDEAS

EUI DONG PAK

MARTIN LEON

HERLINDA LEON

CHERYL THREADGILL

RODJI KISON

VIVIEN RUDEAS

MANUEL MAGANA

ALBERT YANG

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ALISO AIR INC

KB HOME COASTAL INC

Cross Defendants

CUSTOM QUALITY MILLWORK INC

FENCEWORKS INC

AMERICAN COATINGS INC

SOUTHLAND FIREPLACES INC

RCR PLUMBING

RESCOM OVERHEAD DOORS INC

RMW CONSTRUCTION INC

ALISO AIR INC

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

ANDERSON & KRIGER

WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN LLP

LAW OFFICES OF PEGAN & FRASER

CRAIG J. SILVER LAW OFFICES

WEIL & DRAGE APC

KOLETSKY MANCINI FELDMAN & MORROW

Other Attorneys

STRICKROTH & PARKER, LLP

HAMMONS & BALDINO LLP

FREDRICKSON, MAZEIKA & GRANT, LLP

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

AUSTIN, BROWNWOOD & CANNON

LAW OFFICE OF MARC JENNINGS.

OSMAN & ASSOCIATES

HINES SMITH CARDER DINCEL BLAND

STUTZ ARTIANO SHINOFF & HOLTZ

SABAITIS O'CALLAGHAN

LETOFSKY & MCLAIN

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 09/17/2012 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 09/17/2012 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 08/13/2012

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 08/13/2012

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 04/10/2012

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 04/10/2012

CASE REASSIGNED TO STEVEN PERK EFFECTIVE 01/03/2012.

CASE REASSIGNED TO STEVEN PERK EFFECTIVE 01/03/2012.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 12/05/2011

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 12/05/2011

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (CROSS COMPLAINT DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE) FILED BY ALISO AIR INC ON 12/02/2011

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (CROSS COMPLAINT DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE) FILED BY ALISO AIR INC ON 12/02/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE (BY CERTIFIED MAIL) FILED BY MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA ON 11/04/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE (BY CERTIFIED MAIL) FILED BY MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA ON 11/04/2011

REQUEST - OTHER (FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE) FILED BY RII PLASTERING, INC. ON 08/11/2011

REQUEST - OTHER (FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE) FILED BY RII PLASTERING, INC. ON 08/11/2011

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY PETERSON BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC ON 03/03/2011

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY PETERSON BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC ON 03/03/2011

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 08/30/2010

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 08/30/2010

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SOUTHLAND FIREPLACES INC ON 08/19/2010

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SOUTHLAND FIREPLACES INC ON 08/19/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 134- ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 905.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10436544.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 134- ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 905.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10436544.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ALISO AIR INC ON 03/19/2010

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ALISO AIR INC ON 03/19/2010

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY LASCO BATHWARE INC ON 03/02/2010

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY LASCO BATHWARE INC ON 03/02/2010

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (MEDIATION CMO & TIMELINE) FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 03/01/2010

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (MEDIATION CMO & TIMELINE) FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 03/01/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (CROSS COMPLAINT) FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 02/23/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (CROSS COMPLAINT) FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 02/23/2010

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/21/2009 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/21/2009 09:00:00 AM.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BAUER, RONALD.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BAUER, RONALD.

342 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 01/07/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2177554 RECEIVED ON 01/07/2013 01:23:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 09/17/2012 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 08/14/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
507 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KB HOME COASTAL INC ON 05/14/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 05/13/2009 01:40:42 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2009
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/29/2009 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MAGANA, MANUEL ON 03/09/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 26 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10277195 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10101070.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BAUER, RONALD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MAGANA, MANUEL; KISON, RODJI; KISON, ANNE; LEON, MARTIN; LEON, HERLINDA; PAK, EUI DONG; PAK, SOUN HEE ON 12/24/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MAGANA, MANUEL; KISON, RODJI; KISON, ANNE; LEON, MARTIN; LEON, HERLINDA; PAK, EUI DONG; PAK, SOUN HEE ON 12/24/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MAGANA, MANUEL; KISON, RODJI; KISON, ANNE; LEON, MARTIN; LEON, HERLINDA; PAK, EUI DONG; PAK, SOUN HEE ON 12/24/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESCOM OVERHEAD DOORS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CUSTOM QUALITY MILLWORK INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALISO AIR INC is a litigant

Latest cases where RMW Construction Inc is a litigant