Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/24/2016 at 04:22:41 (UTC).

LYLES V KIMMEL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2006 LYLES filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against KIMMEL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3832

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOAN LYLES

Defendants

DEBBIE NELSON

DOROTHY KIMMEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL TIREY AND ST JOHN

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY LYLES, JOAN ON 01/29/2010

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY LYLES, JOAN ON 01/29/2010

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY LYLES, JOAN ON 12/01/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY LYLES, JOAN ON 12/01/2009

LEGACY CASE DOCUMENTS

LEGACY CASE DOCUMENTS

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10227270 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10051145.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10227270 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10051145.

DECLARATION - OTHER (REGARDING THE ORDER OF CREDITING OF MONEY RECEIVED) FILED BY LYLES, JOAN ON 10/16/2008

DECLARATION - OTHER (REGARDING THE ORDER OF CREDITING OF MONEY RECEIVED) FILED BY LYLES, JOAN ON 10/16/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY LYLES, JOAN ON 10/16/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY LYLES, JOAN ON 10/16/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY LYLES, JOAN ON 01/07/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY LYLES, JOAN ON 01/07/2008

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY LYLES, JOAN ON 01/29/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY LYLES, JOAN ON 12/01/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • LEGACY CASE DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10227270 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10051145.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2008
  • WRIT ISSUED FOR ORANGE COUNTY AGAINST DEFENDANTS DOROTHY KIMMEL AND DEBBIE NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (REGARDING THE ORDER OF CREDITING OF MONEY RECEIVED) FILED BY LYLES, JOAN ON 10/16/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY LYLES, JOAN ON 10/16/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY LYLES, JOAN ON 01/07/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED ON 07/03/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY JOAN LYLES ON 07/03/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2007
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST (MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMNT,ACK. OF CREDIT,DECL OF ACCRUED INTEREST) WAS FILED BY JOAN LYLES ON 07/03/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED ON 08/31/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED ON 08/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED) WAS FILED ON 08/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 08/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • DOCUMENT - OTHER (SPECIAL FILING SEE REMARKS) WAS FILED ON 08/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF APPLICATION AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED ON 08/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST (MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMNT,ACK. OF CREDIT,DECL OF ACCRUED INTEREST) WAS FILED BY JOAN LYLES ON 08/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less