This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/16/2016 at 09:46:49 (UTC).

LEWIS VS RUIZ

Case Summary

On 04/21/2006 LEWIS filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against RUIZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5351

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

JIMMIE LEWIS

INLAND ESCROW

DARRELL BOWNE

ANGELA G COTTON

GREGORY THOMAS SILLETTO

TERRY WALLACE

BRADFORD WARREN

KARINA RUIZ

AMERICAN FINANCE

EQUITY NATION

ANDREW WILLIAMS

PATRICIA BELL

DANA CAPITAL

Defendants and Cross Defendants

INLAND ESCROW

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION

GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY

GREGORY THOMAS SILLETTO

TERRY WALLACE

BRADFORD WARREN

KARINA RUIZ

AMERICAN FINANCE

DANA CAPITAL GROUP

EQUITY NATION

ANDREW WILLIAMS

TODAR INVESTMENT INCORPORATED

DARRELL BROWNE

CHICAGO TITLE

AMELIA D TORREZ

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MARC R. TOW & ASSOCIATES

GREGORY T ANNIGIAN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LANDON VILLAVASO

HERSHORIN & HENRY LLP

GREGORY T. ANNIGIAN-LAW OFFICES OF

Other Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER E DEAL

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10365930 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10189804.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10365930 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10189804.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY REJECTED ON 04/13/2009.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY REJECTED ON 04/13/2009.

NOTICE - OTHER (LODGMENT OF DEPOSITIONS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROVE-UP) FILED BY LEWIS, JIMMIE ON 03/18/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (LODGMENT OF DEPOSITIONS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROVE-UP) FILED BY LEWIS, JIMMIE ON 03/18/2009

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT W/O JUDGMENT PACKAGE) FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 03/11/2009

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT W/O JUDGMENT PACKAGE) FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 03/11/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 03/03/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 03/03/2009

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING 02/25/2009 03:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING 02/25/2009 03:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 11/05/2008 03:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 11/05/2008 03:00:00 PM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 11/05/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 11/05/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 06/13/2008 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 06/13/2008 08:30:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (ADR PACKAGE) FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 05/01/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (ADR PACKAGE) FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 05/01/2008

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 05/01/2008

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 05/01/2008

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 04/02/2008

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 04/02/2008

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 03/25/2008

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 03/25/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 03/25/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 03/25/2008

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 03/25/2008

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 03/25/2008

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 03/19/2008

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 03/19/2008

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 03/19/2008

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 03/19/2008

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 02/06/2008

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 02/06/2008

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10365930 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10189804.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY REJECTED ON 04/13/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY ON 03/18/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING BRIEF) FILED BY LEWIS, JIMMIE ON 03/18/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
165 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2006
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (EX PARTE MOTION/APPLICATION) WAS FILED BY JIMMIE LEWIS ON 07/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2006
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (EX PARTE MOTION/APPLICATION) WAS FILED BY JIMMIE LEWIS ON 07/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2006
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (EX PARTE MOTION/APPLICATION) WAS FILED BY JIMMIE LEWIS ON 07/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2006
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED BY JIMMIE LEWIS ON 07/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY JIMMIE LEWIS ON 07/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 07/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 07/03/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2006
  • SUMMONS RETURNED (SUMMONS) WAS FILED BY JIMMIE LEWIS ON 04/25/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY JIMMIE LEWIS ON 04/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 04/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.