Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/13/2019 at 02:13:37 (UTC).

LAURA MASHNI VS. PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/28/2009 LAURA MASHNI filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against PULTE HOME CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHANTAL FLORES

SHAHRAM SHAHRESTANI

ANTOINE DIAB

CANDICE HERNANDEZ

ANDRE KHOURI

SANDRA LOPEZ

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CANAC KITCHENS

CDR CONCRETE, INC.

PULTE HOME CORPORATION

RELIABLE CONTRACTORS, INC.

Cross Defendants

WEST COAST INTERIORS INC.,

RCR PLUMBING AND MECHANICAL, INC.

CANAC KITCHENS

FIREPLACE DISTRIBUTORS, INC.

QUALITY INTERIORS, INC.

AM/PAM LDI MECHANICAL, INC.

CDR CONCRETE, INC.

JPS SURFACE SOLUTIONS, INC.

RELIABLE CONTRACTORS, INC.

SOUTH COAST STAIRS, INC.

QUAD COUNTY WINDOW & DOOR INC

PREFERRED FRAMING, INC.

MALCOLM DRYWALL, INC.

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLAYTON M. ANDERSON & ASSOCIATES, A.P.C.

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MURCHISON & CUMMING, LLP

HINES SMITH CARDER DINCEL BLAND

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & OMEARA LLP

JEFFERY & GROSFELD LLP

LETOFSKY MCCLAIN

BULLARD BROWN & BEAL LLP

LAW OFFICES OF PEGAN & FRASER

DEMLER ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND

Other Attorneys

KENNEDY & SOUZA, APC

LAW OFFICES OF ZAIDA A. MCGHEE

MCMAHON LAW FIRM INC

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH, LLP

KENNICK & ASSOCIATES

COATS ROSE YALE RYMAN & LEE, P.C.

STUTZ ARTIANO SHINOFF & HOLTZ

ZAIDA A. MCGHEE

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY PULTE HOME CORPORATION ON 09/22/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY PULTE HOME CORPORATION ON 09/22/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11655204 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11479285.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11655204 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11479285.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY PULTE HOME CORPORATION ON 06/19/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY PULTE HOME CORPORATION ON 06/19/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11593738 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11417763.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11593738 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11417763.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/14/2013

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/14/2013

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) FILED BY PANETT CORPORATION ON 06/29/2012

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) FILED BY PANETT CORPORATION ON 06/29/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11121327 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10945219.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11121327 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10945219.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/14/2012.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/14/2012.

STIPULATION TO JUDGE PRO TEM FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/15/2011

STIPULATION TO JUDGE PRO TEM FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/15/2011

OBJECTION (TO ADDITIONAL REPLY BRIEF RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) FILED BY MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC. ON 09/19/2011

OBJECTION (TO ADDITIONAL REPLY BRIEF RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) FILED BY MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC. ON 09/19/2011

OBJECTION (EVIDENTIAY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) FILED BY RELIABLE CONTRACTORS, INC. ON 09/08/2011

OBJECTION (EVIDENTIAY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) FILED BY RELIABLE CONTRACTORS, INC. ON 09/08/2011

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/07/2011.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/07/2011.

RESPONSE (TO SEPARATE STATEMENT) FILED BY MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC. ON 09/06/2011

RESPONSE (TO SEPARATE STATEMENT) FILED BY MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC. ON 09/06/2011

OBJECTION FILED BY QUAD COUNTY WINDOW & DOOR INC ON 02/04/2011

OBJECTION FILED BY QUAD COUNTY WINDOW & DOOR INC ON 02/04/2011

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RELIABLE CONTRACTORS, INC. ON 07/07/2010

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RELIABLE CONTRACTORS, INC. ON 07/07/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PULTE HOME CORPORATION ON 04/27/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PULTE HOME CORPORATION ON 04/27/2010

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PULTE HOME CORPORATION ON 03/19/2010

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PULTE HOME CORPORATION ON 03/19/2010

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER ANDLER, GAIL.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER ANDLER, GAIL.

365 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2366444 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 10/20/2014 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY MASHNI, LAURA; DIAB, ANTOINE; DIAB, MARY; LOPEZ, JAVIER; LOPEZ, SANDRA; KHOURI, ANDRE; BECK, JOHN; HERNANDEZ, OSTES; HERNANDEZ, CANDICE; SINGH BRAR, ANJIT;OTHERS ON 10/09/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4260077 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2014 03:36:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ROUT 66 ROOFING CO., INC ON 06/14/10) FILED BY ROUTE 66 ROOFING COMPANY, INC. ON 10/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2374166 RECEIVED ON 10/07/2014 04:45:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CDR CONCRETE, INC. ON 06/14/10) FILED BY CDR CONCRETE, INC. ON 10/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2374162 RECEIVED ON 10/07/2014 04:45:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
575 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (PLAINTIFF BRIEF OBJECTIVE SUMMARY OF THE CASE) FILED BY MASHNI, LAURA ON 07/01/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MASHNI, LAURA ON 06/16/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (OF STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY MASHNI, LAURA ON 05/26/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/20/2009 02:31:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/08/2009 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 26 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 900.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10365129 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10189003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER ANDLER, GAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MASHNI, LAURA; DIAB, ANTOINE; DIAB, MARY; LOPEZ, JAVIER; LOPEZ, SANDRA; KHOURI, ANDRE; BECK, JOHN; HERNANDEZ, OSTES; HERNANDEZ, CANDICE; SINGH BRAR, ANJIT; SHAHRESTANI, SHAHRAM; ABAB, MARJANEH; SCHATZMAN, BENJAMIN; SCHATZMAN, AMY; FLORES, LARRY; FLORES, CHANTAL; MUZYKA, WALTER; MUZYKA, ELIZABETH; FLORES ORTIZ, JUAN ON 04/29/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MASHNI, LAURA; DIAB, ANTOINE; DIAB, MARY; LOPEZ, JAVIER; LOPEZ, SANDRA; KHOURI, ANDRE; BECK, JOHN; HERNANDEZ, OSTES; HERNANDEZ, CANDICE; SINGH BRAR, ANJIT; SHAHRESTANI, SHAHRAM; ABAB, MARJANEH; SCHATZMAN, BENJAMIN; SCHATZMAN, AMY; FLORES, LARRY; FLORES, CHANTAL; MUZYKA, WALTER; MUZYKA, ELIZABETH; FLORES ORTIZ, JUAN ON 04/29/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MASHNI, LAURA; DIAB, ANTOINE; DIAB, MARY; LOPEZ, JAVIER; LOPEZ, SANDRA; KHOURI, ANDRE; BECK, JOHN; HERNANDEZ, OSTES; HERNANDEZ, CANDICE; SINGH BRAR, ANJIT; SHAHRESTANI, SHAHRAM; ABAB, MARJANEH; SCHATZMAN, BENJAMIN; SCHATZMAN, AMY; FLORES, LARRY; FLORES, CHANTAL; MUZYKA, WALTER; MUZYKA, ELIZABETH; FLORES ORTIZ, JUAN ON 04/29/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTH COAST STAIRS is a litigant

Latest cases where QUALITY INTERIORS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Reliable Contractors Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where MALCOLM DRYWALL INC is a litigant