This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/29/2016 at 03:40:24 (UTC).

JOSENHANS VS SMITH

Case Summary

On 10/23/2006 JOSENHANS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SMITH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4547

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ONETA JOSEHANS, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOSE

ONETA JOSEHANS, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOSENHANS FAMILY TRUST

Defendants

TONY SMITH

STEPHANIE SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIDDLE & LIDDLE : LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

BENCH WARRANT RETURNED FILED BY ONETA JOSEHANS, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOSENHANS FAMILY TRUST ON 01/14/2008

BENCH WARRANT RETURNED FILED BY ONETA JOSEHANS, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOSENHANS FAMILY TRUST ON 01/14/2008

BENCH WARRANT RETURNED FILED BY ONETA JOSEHANS, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOSENHANS FAMILY TRUST ON 01/14/2008

BENCH WARRANT RETURNED FILED BY ONETA JOSEHANS, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOSENHANS FAMILY TRUST ON 01/14/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 01/23/2008 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 01/23/2008 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 01/09/2008 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 01/09/2008 08:30:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • BENCH WARRANT RETURNED FILED BY ONETA JOSEHANS, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOSENHANS FAMILY TRUST ON 01/14/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • BENCH WARRANT RETURNED FILED BY ONETA JOSEHANS, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOSENHANS FAMILY TRUST ON 01/14/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 01/23/2008 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2008
  • BENCH WARRANT RECALLED FOR TONY SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 01/09/2008 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2008
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 01/23/2008 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2006
  • AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM (AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM) WAS FILED BY ONETA JOSEHANS, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOSENHANS FAMILY TRUST ON 11/03/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2006
  • ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (AMENDED ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY TONY SMITH ON 11/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2006
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS (ORDER FEE WAIVER GRANTED) WAS FILED ON 10/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2006
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS (ORDER FEE WAIVER GRANTED) WAS FILED BY STEPHANIE SMITH ON 10/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 10/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2006
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY TONY SMITH ON 10/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED) WAS FILED ON 10/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 10/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY ONETA JOSEHANS, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOSENHANS FAMILY TRUST ON 10/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less