This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/02/2016 at 09:59:04 (UTC).

JAN CURREY TRUSTEE VS JOAN RIACH TRUSTEE

Case Summary

On 05/21/2007 JAN CURREY TRUSTEE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOAN RIACH TRUSTEE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6088

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAN CURREY TRUSTEE OF THE CURREY FAMILY TRUST OF OCTOBER 17

Defendants

ROBERT M MAYMAN TRUSTEE OF THE CAPE COD IRREVOCABLE TRUST OF

ERWIN BOYCHENKO

FRANK LINDEN

NORTHBROOKE

JOAN RIACH TRUSTEE OF THE RIACH FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARTON, KLUGMAN & OETTING LLP

Defendant Attorneys

ROBERT M MAYMAN

LUCE, FORWARD, HAMILTON & SCRIPPS LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JAN CURREY TRUSTEE OF THE CURREY FAMILY TRUST OF OCTOBER 17 ON 02/28/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JAN CURREY TRUSTEE OF THE CURREY FAMILY TRUST OF OCTOBER 17 ON 02/28/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JAN CURREY TRUSTEE OF THE CURREY FAMILY TRUST OF OCTOBER 17 ON 02/21/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JAN CURREY TRUSTEE OF THE CURREY FAMILY TRUST OF OCTOBER 17 ON 02/21/2008

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY NORTHBROOKE ON 02/13/2008

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY NORTHBROOKE ON 02/13/2008

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY JOAN RIACH TRUSTEE OF THE RIACH FAMILY TRUST ON 02/13/2008

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY JOAN RIACH TRUSTEE OF THE RIACH FAMILY TRUST ON 02/13/2008

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY JAN CURREY TRUSTEE OF THE CURREY FAMILY TRUST OF OCTOBER 17 ON 02/14/2008

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY JAN CURREY TRUSTEE OF THE CURREY FAMILY TRUST OF OCTOBER 17 ON 02/14/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/11/2008 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/11/2008 08:30:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JAN CURREY TRUSTEE OF THE CURREY FAMILY TRUST OF OCTOBER 17 ON 02/28/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2008
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JAN CURREY TRUSTEE OF THE CURREY FAMILY TRUST OF OCTOBER 17 ON 02/21/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY NORTHBROOKE ON 02/13/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY JOAN RIACH TRUSTEE OF THE RIACH FAMILY TRUST ON 02/13/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY JAN CURREY TRUSTEE OF THE CURREY FAMILY TRUST OF OCTOBER 17 ON 02/14/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/11/2008 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2008
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 03/10/2008 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2008
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/10/2008 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2008
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 03/10/2008 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2007
  • OTHER ACTIONS (UNDOCUMENTED ACTION-APPEARANCE FEE) WAS FILED BY JOAN RIACH TRUSTEE OF THE RIACH FAMILY TRUST ON 06/25/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 06/20/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY JAN CURREY TRUSTEE OF THE CURREY FAMILY TRUST OF OCTOBER 17 ON 06/01/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2007
  • DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE (CERTIFICATE OF DUE DILIGENCE) WAS FILED BY JAN CURREY TRUSTEE OF THE CURREY FAMILY TRUST OF OCTOBER 17 ON 06/01/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY JAN CURREY TRUSTEE OF THE CURREY FAMILY TRUST OF OCTOBER 17 ON 06/01/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY JAN CURREY TRUSTEE OF THE CURREY FAMILY TRUST OF OCTOBER 17 ON 06/01/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY JAN CURREY TRUSTEE OF THE CURREY FAMILY TRUST OF OCTOBER 17 ON 06/01/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2007
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY JAN CURREY TRUSTEE OF THE CURREY FAMILY TRUST OF OCTOBER 17 ON 05/21/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2007
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY JAN CURREY TRUSTEE OF THE CURREY FAMILY TRUST OF OCTOBER 17 ON 05/21/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2007
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 05/21/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE RICH FAMILY TRUST is a litigant