This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/22/2016 at 11:17:24 (UTC).

IRVINE VS PACHKOFSKY

Case Summary

On 07/14/2006 IRVINE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PACHKOFSKY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2983

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITI

THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC

Defendant

DAVID PACHKOFSKY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WELLS LAW GROUP

WELLS LAW GROUP, APC

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 03/16/2016

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 03/16/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11838643 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11662873.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11838643 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11662873.

WRIT (ISSUED 8/26/15) RECEIVED ON 08/21/2015.

WRIT (ISSUED 8/26/15) RECEIVED ON 08/21/2015.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/21/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/21/2015

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/21/2015

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/21/2015

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/21/2015

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/21/2015

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 03/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11838643 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11662873.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 8/26/15) RECEIVED ON 08/21/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3322965 RECEIVED ON 08/21/2015 01:53:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2007
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED (WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED) WAS FILED BY WELLS LAW GROUP ON 07/06/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2006
  • WRIT ISSUED ON 08/08/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY UD - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2006
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2006
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (APPL & ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING (UD)) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 07/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED) WAS FILED ON 07/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 07/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 07/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 07/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.