Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/22/2016 at 11:16:47 (UTC).

IRVINE VS JEBRAIL

Case Summary

On 07/14/2006 IRVINE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JEBRAIL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2984

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITI

THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC

Defendant

SUZIE JEBRAIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WELLS LAW GROUP

THE JUDGE LAW FIRM

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 10/13/2016

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 10/13/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11839385 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11663642.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11839385 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11663642.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 8/27/2015) RECEIVED ON 08/21/2015.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 8/27/2015) RECEIVED ON 08/21/2015.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/21/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/21/2015

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/21/2015

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/21/2015

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/21/2015

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/21/2015

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 06/10/2015 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 06/10/2015 08:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11743715 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11567906.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11743715 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11567906.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR (FILED AND ENTERED 2/27/2015) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 02/26/2015

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR (FILED AND ENTERED 2/27/2015) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 02/26/2015

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 10/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11839385 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11663642.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 8/27/2015) RECEIVED ON 08/21/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2402001 RECEIVED ON 08/21/2015 04:40:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 06/10/2015 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 06/10/2015 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11743715 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11567906.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF TRIAL NON-JURY) WAS FILED ON 07/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2006
  • AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM (AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 07/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 07/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 07/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2006
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS (ORDER FEE WAIVER GRANTED) WAS FILED ON 07/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2006
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY SUZIE JEBRAIL ON 07/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED) WAS FILED ON 07/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 07/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 07/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 07/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant