This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/22/2016 at 10:52:40 (UTC).

IRVINE VS DIETRICH

Case Summary

On 07/13/2006 IRVINE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DIETRICH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2951

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITI

THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC

Defendants

LARRY SWINCKI

JAMES DIETRICH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WELLS LAW GROUP

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/05/2016

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/05/2016

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/23/2016

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/23/2016

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/31/2016

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/31/2016

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 8/31/2016) RECEIVED ON 08/31/2016.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 8/31/2016) RECEIVED ON 08/31/2016.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/31/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/31/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER (IN SUPPORT OF MEMORANDUM) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/31/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER (IN SUPPORT OF MEMORANDUM) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/31/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12023315 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11847326.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12023315 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11847326.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 09/01/2016

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 09/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 09/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 09/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 09/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 09/01/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 09/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 09/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 09/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4599774 RECEIVED ON 09/01/2016 07:46:29 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12023315 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11847326.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (IN SUPPORT OF MEMORANDUM) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/31/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/31/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 8/31/2016) RECEIVED ON 08/31/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/31/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2489951 RECEIVED ON 08/31/2016 09:10:36 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2006
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY UD - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2006
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 08/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED) WAS FILED ON 07/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 07/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC ON 07/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 07/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant