This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/06/2016 at 11:11:55 (UTC).

IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY VS RADER

Case Summary

On 02/13/2004 IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against RADER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0675

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Defendants

SCOTT RADER

KATHERINE TOWNSEND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN, LLP

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY REJECTED ON 01/11/2014.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY REJECTED ON 01/11/2014.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/03/2014

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/03/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/03/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/03/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 02/03/14) RECEIVED ON 02/03/2014.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 02/03/14) RECEIVED ON 02/03/2014.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/03/2014

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/03/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11537927 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11361772.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11537927 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11361772.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141- CERTIFYING A COPY, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 26.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11542070 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11365895.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141- CERTIFYING A COPY, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 26.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11542070 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11365895.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/06/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/06/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/06/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/06/2014

WRIT (ISSUED 05/01/2014) RECEIVED ON 04/29/2014.

WRIT (ISSUED 05/01/2014) RECEIVED ON 04/29/2014.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 04/29/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 04/29/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11586368 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11410373.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11586368 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11410373.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/11/2015

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/11/2015

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/11/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4326858 RECEIVED ON 02/11/2015 03:44:52 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11586368 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11410373.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 04/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (ISSUED 05/01/2014) RECEIVED ON 04/29/2014.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3139116 RECEIVED ON 04/29/2014 11:43:33 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/06/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/06/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2307999 RECEIVED ON 02/06/2014 07:04:32 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141- CERTIFYING A COPY, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 26.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11542070 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11365895.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2004
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2004
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2004
  • DocketTHE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FOR IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY IN THE AMOUNT OF 4300.00 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 219.30 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 430.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST RADER, SCOTT ;TOWNSEND, KATHERINE .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2004
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 04/21/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2004
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY RADER, SCOTT ON 02/25/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2004
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY RADER, SCOTT ON 02/23/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2004
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY TOWNSEND, KATHERINE ON 02/25/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2004
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY TOWNSEND, KATHERINE ON 02/23/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2004
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/13/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2004
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less