This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/29/2022 at 09:35:11 (UTC).

IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. VS. WESTERN NATIONAL CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 10/29/2010 IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L P filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against WESTERN NATIONAL CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants, Intervenors and Interested Parties

AXIS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

SAN MARINO PLASTERING, INC.

CELL-CRETE CORPORATION

TINCO SHEET METAL, INC.

LDI MECHANICAL, INC.

ZASTROW CONSTRUCTION, INC.

PACIFIC FINISH COMMERCIAL DIVISION

NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

AIG SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

GROUP M ENGINEERS

REGENCY ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC.

COURTNEY, INC.

WILLIAM F. WILSON

Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants, Defendants and Intervenors

SAN MARINO PLASTERING, INC.

CELL-CRETE CORPORATION

TINCO SHEET METAL, INC.

LDI MECHANICAL, INC.

CAPITAL DRYWALL, INC.

ZASTROW CONSTRUCTION, INC.

NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

AIG SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

COURTNEY, INC.

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Intervenors

VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

SAN MARINO PLASTERING, INC.

CELL-CRETE CORPORATION

L I METAL SYSTEMS, INC.

TINCO SHEET METAL, INC.

LDI MECHANICAL, INC.

CAPITAL DRYWALL, INC.

ZASTROW CONSTRUCTION, INC.

CARL FRAYSER MCLARAND

PACIFIC FINISH COMMERCIAL DIVISION

NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

AIG SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

GROUP M ENGINEERS

REGENCY ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC.

TL FABRICATIONS, INC.

COURTNEY, INC.

CETCO BUILDING MATERIALS GROUP

BUILDERS TRIM & DOOR

184 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Intervenor, Interested Party and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CHAPMAN GLUCKSMAN DEAN ROEB & BARGER

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID L. BRAULT

KOLETSKY MANCINI FELDMAN & MORROW

LAW OFFICES OF ERIC G. ANDERSON

NORTHRUP SCHLUETER

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID L. BRAULT

KOLETSKY MANCINI FELDMAN & MORROW

NORTHRUP SCHLUETER

LAW OFFICES OF ERIC G. ANDERSON

COLLINS, COLLINS, MUIR & STEWART

Defendant, Intervenor and Interested Party Attorney

CHAPMAN GLUCKSMAN DEAN ROEB & BARGER

Other Attorneys

COLLINS COLLINS MUIR + STEWART LLP

MARRONE, ROBINSON, FREDERICK & FOSTER

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID J. HARTER, APC

GAGLIONE, DOLAN & KAPLAN

MARSHALL & FRENCH

BISTLINE COHOON & LUYMES

FERRIS & ASSOCIATES

BOOTH LLP

ANGULO MCGHEE, PLC.

VAN DE POEL, LEVY & ALLEN, LLP

THE LEE LAW GROUP, PC

MURTAUGH MEYER NELSON & TREGLIA LLP

BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

BRADY, VORWERCK, RYDER & CASPINO

66 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 10/29/2010

COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 10/29/2010

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3542658 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3542658 REJECTED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY SUBMITTED BY R.E.M. CONCEPTS, INC. REJECTED ON 11/07/2017.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY SUBMITTED BY R.E.M. CONCEPTS, INC. REJECTED ON 11/07/2017.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY R.E.M. CONCEPTS, INC. ON 11/07/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY R.E.M. CONCEPTS, INC. ON 11/07/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4499873 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4499873 REJECTED.

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 11/01/2017

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 11/01/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 09/18/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 09/18/2017 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TINCO SHEET METAL, INC. ON 09/06/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TINCO SHEET METAL, INC. ON 09/06/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TINCO SHEET METAL, INC. ON 09/05/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TINCO SHEET METAL, INC. ON 09/05/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MT HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 08/25/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MT HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 08/25/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BELMAR CONSTRUCTION, INC.; NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 08/24/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BELMAR CONSTRUCTION, INC.; NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 08/24/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BELMAR CONSTRUCTION, INC.; NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 08/24/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BELMAR CONSTRUCTION, INC.; NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 08/24/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY R.E.M. CONCEPTS, INC. ON 08/24/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY R.E.M. CONCEPTS, INC. ON 08/24/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2585868 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2585868 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/23/2017 09:55:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/23/2017 09:55:00 AM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3579694 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3579694 REJECTED.

1,475 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3542658 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2610257 RECEIVED ON 11/07/2017 01:18:44 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY R.E.M. CONCEPTS, INC. ON 11/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY SUBMITTED BY R.E.M. CONCEPTS, INC. REJECTED ON 11/07/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4499873 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1436703 RECEIVED ON 11/01/2017 04:03:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 11/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 09/18/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
2,425 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 11/19/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/01/2011 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX105 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 02/01/2011 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX105.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2010-11-16 08:36:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 215698 RECEIVED ON 10/29/2010 03:00:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 166 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 945.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10762100 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10585992.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 10/29/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 10/29/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IRVINE APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, L.P. ON 10/29/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER STOCK, NANCY ON 10/29/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ZASTROW CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA RELIANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where TL FABRICATIONS L.P is a litigant

Latest cases where REGENCY ALUMINUM PRODUCTS INC is a litigant