This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/13/2016 at 11:44:09 (UTC).

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS VS CHRISTMAS

Case Summary

On 07/18/2003 INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHRISTMAS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4343

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2003

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC.

Defendant

GARY CHRISTMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFREY FLETTERICK

Defendant Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORA

 

Court Documents

LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 07/14/2008

LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 07/14/2008

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 07/14/2008

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 07/14/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 04/13/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 04/13/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10354190 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10178064.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10354190 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10178064.

MOTION - OTHER (FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER FOR INDEPENDENT CONTRACTOR ACCOUNTS RECEIVABLE) FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 07/24/2009

MOTION - OTHER (FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER FOR INDEPENDENT CONTRACTOR ACCOUNTS RECEIVABLE) FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 07/24/2009

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF LAJUAN E WOOD) FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 07/24/2009

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF LAJUAN E WOOD) FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 07/24/2009

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 07/24/2009

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 07/24/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10432502 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10256376.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10432502 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10256376.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 08/07/2009 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 08/07/2009 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 09/21/2009 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 09/21/2009 01:30:00 PM.

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 02/19/2010

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 02/19/2010

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 08/19/2010

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 08/19/2010

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 03/23/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 03/23/2011

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2012
  • DocketTRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 03/23/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 08/19/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 02/19/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 09/21/2009 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • DocketCOURT ORDERED ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (OF LAJUAN E WOOD) FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 07/24/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - OTHER (FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER FOR INDEPENDENT CONTRACTOR ACCOUNTS RECEIVABLE) FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 07/24/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10354190 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10178064.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2009
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 04/13/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 07/14/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2003
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2003
  • DocketCOURT ENTERS JUDGMENT FOR INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. IN THE AMOUNT OF 3303.94 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST CHRISTMAS, GARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ON 07/14/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2008
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC is a litigant