Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/17/2016 at 07:28:39 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF FAIRWAGELAW

Case Summary

On 08/29/2005 IN THE MATTER OF FAIRWAGELAW was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1320

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2005

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants, Petitioners, Respondents and Respondent / Appellees

DAVID J FULLER

JOHN M HEURLIN

GREGOR, GARRETT S., LAW OFFICES OF

SCHRENKER LAW FIRM APC

JOHN M. HUERLIN AS SHAREHOLDER OF FAIR

LAW OFFICES OF GARRETT S. GREGOR

JOHN M. HUERLIN AS SHAREHOLDER OF FAIRWAGE LAW APC

SCHRENKER LAW FIRM APC-THE

FAIRWAGELAW APC

HENRY P. SCHRENKER

HENRY P. SCHRENKER AS OFFICE & DIRECTO

FULLER & SCHRENKER, APC

SCHRENKER LAW FIRM-THE

FULLER & SCHRENKER

HENRY P. SCHRENKER AS OFFICER & DIRECT

DAVID J. FULLER AS OFFICER & DIRECTOR

HENRY P. SCHRENKER AS OFFICE & DIRECTOR OF FULLER & SCHRENKE

HENRY P SCHRENKER

HENRY P. SCHRENKER AS OFFICER & DIRECTOR OF FAIRWAGE LAW APC

DAVID J. FULLER AS OFFICER & DIRECTOR OF FULLER & SCHRENKER

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant, Respondent and Appellant

JOHN M HEURLIN

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Defendant, Cross Plaintiff, Petitioner, Respondent / Appellee and Respondent Attorneys

GREGOR, GARRETT S., LAW OFFICES OF

LAW OFFICES OF GARRETT S. GREGOR

JOHN M. HEURLIN-LAW OFFICE OF

LAW OFFICE OF JOHN M. HEURLIN

LAW OFFICES OF GARRET S. GREGOR

SCHRENKER LAW FIRM APC-THE

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant, Respondent and Appellant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF JOHN M. HEURLIN

Plaintiff, Defendant, Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant, Petitioner, Respondent and Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF GARRETT S. GREGOR

LAW OFFICE OF JOHN M. HEURLIN

JOHN M. HEURLIN-LAW OFFICE OF

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY FAIRWAGELAW APC; FULLER, DAVID J; FULLER, DAVID J; SCHRENKER, HENRY P. ON 05/04/2015

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY FAIRWAGELAW APC; FULLER, DAVID J; FULLER, DAVID J; SCHRENKER, HENRY P. ON 05/04/2015

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/25/2013.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/25/2013.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY HEURLIN, JOHN M ON 06/06/2014

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY HEURLIN, JOHN M ON 06/06/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/15/2014 07:50:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/15/2014 07:50:00 AM.

RESPONSE FILED BY HEURLIN, JOHN M ON 12/04/2013

RESPONSE FILED BY HEURLIN, JOHN M ON 12/04/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11484536 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11308448.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11484536 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11308448.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY HEURLIN, JOHN M ON 07/11/2013

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY HEURLIN, JOHN M ON 07/11/2013

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY HEURLIN, JOHN M ON 07/16/2012

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY HEURLIN, JOHN M ON 07/16/2012

MOTION FOR SLAPP FILED BY HEURLIN, JOHN M ON 04/20/2010

MOTION FOR SLAPP FILED BY HEURLIN, JOHN M ON 04/20/2010

ORDER GRANTING (/DENYING HEULIN'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE) FILED BY HEURLIN, JOHN M ON 03/01/2010

ORDER GRANTING (/DENYING HEULIN'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE) FILED BY HEURLIN, JOHN M ON 03/01/2010

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JOINDER 02/25/2010 03:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JOINDER 02/25/2010 03:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 02/25/2010 11:31:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 02/25/2010 11:31:00 AM.

OBJECTION FILED BY HEURLIN, JOHN M ON 02/11/2010

OBJECTION FILED BY HEURLIN, JOHN M ON 02/11/2010

MOTION FOR JOINDER FILED BY FAIRWAGELAW APC ON 02/04/2010

MOTION FOR JOINDER FILED BY FAIRWAGELAW APC ON 02/04/2010

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY HEURLIN, JOHN M ON 02/22/2008

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY HEURLIN, JOHN M ON 02/22/2008

REPLY TO OPPOSITION (TO MOTION IN LIMINE) FILED BY SCHRENKER LAW FIRM APC ON 04/07/2008

REPLY TO OPPOSITION (TO MOTION IN LIMINE) FILED BY SCHRENKER LAW FIRM APC ON 04/07/2008

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY SCHRENKER LAW FIRM APC ON 01/24/2008

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY SCHRENKER LAW FIRM APC ON 01/24/2008

471 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HEURLIN, JOHN M ON 09/09/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3455839 RECEIVED ON 09/09/2016 04:46:26 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FULLER, DAVID J; SCHRENKER, HENRY P; SCHRENKER LAW FIRM APC; FULLER & SCHRENKER, APC; FULLER, DAVID J ON 09/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1342761 RECEIVED ON 09/12/2016 12:17:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/23/2016 08:21:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • THE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 09/19/2016 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/19/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE REASSIGNED TO C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 09/01/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
918 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY SCHRENKER LAW FIRM APC ON 10/12/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY SCHRENKER LAW FIRM APC ON 10/12/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2005
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED BY SCHRENKER LAW FIRM APC ON 10/04/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2005
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED BY SCHRENKER LAW FIRM APC ON 10/04/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY SCHRENKER LAW FIRM APC ON 10/03/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY SCHRENKER LAW FIRM APC ON 10/03/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY DAVID J FULLER ON 10/03/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION (PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION) WAS FILED BY SCHRENKER LAW FIRM APC ON 08/29/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 08/29/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET) WAS FILED BY SCHRENKER LAW FIRM APC ON 08/29/2005

    Read MoreRead Less