Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 07:51:02 (UTC).

ICAC VS GOGGINS

Case Summary

On 09/28/2006 ICAC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GOGGINS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4210

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITI

THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC.

Defendants

KRISTEN DOUGLAS

PEARL GOGGINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

WELLS LAW GROUP

THE JUDGE LAW FIRM

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 06/30/2016

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 06/30/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11871586 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11695783.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11871586 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11695783.

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 10/23/2015

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 10/23/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 10/23/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 10/23/2015

WRIT (ISSUED 11/2/15) RECEIVED ON 10/23/2015.

WRIT (ISSUED 11/2/15) RECEIVED ON 10/23/2015.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 09/09/2014

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 09/09/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 09/09/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 09/09/2014

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 06/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11871586 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11695783.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 10/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 10/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 11/2/15) RECEIVED ON 10/23/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4454588 RECEIVED ON 10/23/2015 03:01:24 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 09/09/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 09/09/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3187940 RECEIVED ON 09/09/2014 01:45:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2007
  • MEMORANDUM FOR SETTING FOR HEARING (MEMO TO SET CASE FOR HEARING) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/05/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2007
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/05/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 11/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 11/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 11/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 10/05/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED) WAS FILED ON 09/29/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 09/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 09/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 09/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant