This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/12/2016 at 07:22:19 (UTC).

HOROWITZ VS CLARITY ADVISOR CONSULTANTS

Case Summary

On 01/06/2005 HOROWITZ filed an Other lawsuit against CLARITY ADVISOR CONSULTANTS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1934

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2005

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

BRIAN HOROWITZ

LEE & ASSOCIATES-ORANGE INC

NAI CAPITAL INC

CAPITAL COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE

WGP LLC

PAUL ANTOLIN

MVP LEADS REAL ESTATE SERVICES

CLARITY ADVISOR CONSULTANTS INC

FIRST CAPITAL GROUP LP

K2 INC

CAPITAL COMMERICAL REAL ESTATE SERVICE

COAST FINANCIAL GROUP

SANDRA TATE

MICHAEL JOSEPH HALLAM

CLARITY ADVISOR CONSULTANTS INC.

ROBERT ORR

COAST FINANCIAL

MVP LEADS

KATHY ORR

Defendants and Appellants

WGP LLC

MVP LEADS REAL ESTATE SERVICES

K2 INC

COAST FINANCIAL GROUP

CHRISTOPHER ALAN TATE

SANDRA TATE

Cross Plaintiff and Appellant

CHRISTOPHER ALAN TATE

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

PISTONE & WOLDER LLP

SHAFRON & KAMMER

SHULMAN HODGES & BASTIAN LLP

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE SUBMITTED BY HOROWITZ, BRIAN REJECTED ON 09/20/2012.

CORRESPONDENCE SUBMITTED BY HOROWITZ, BRIAN REJECTED ON 09/20/2012.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC; LEE & ASSOCIATES-ORANGE INC ON 07/26/2010

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC; LEE & ASSOCIATES-ORANGE INC ON 07/26/2010

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED (RIVERSIDE COUNTY) FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC; LEE & ASSOCIATES-ORANGE INC ON 06/08/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED (RIVERSIDE COUNTY) FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC; LEE & ASSOCIATES-ORANGE INC ON 06/08/2009

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC; LEE & ASSOCIATES-ORANGE INC ON 02/06/2009

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC; LEE & ASSOCIATES-ORANGE INC ON 02/06/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10082412 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 106779.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10082412 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 106779.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC ON 03/27/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC ON 03/27/2008

DECLARATION FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION/POSSESSION/SALE (ORANGE) FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC ON 03/27/2008

DECLARATION FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION/POSSESSION/SALE (ORANGE) FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC ON 03/27/2008

DECLARATION FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION/POSSESSION/SALE SUBMITTED BY NAI CAPITAL INC REJECTED ON 03/13/2008.

DECLARATION FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION/POSSESSION/SALE SUBMITTED BY NAI CAPITAL INC REJECTED ON 03/13/2008.

DECLARATION FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION/POSSESSION/SALE SUBMITTED BY NAI CAPITAL INC REJECTED ON 02/26/2008.

DECLARATION FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION/POSSESSION/SALE SUBMITTED BY NAI CAPITAL INC REJECTED ON 02/26/2008.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10060954 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 85341.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10060954 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 85341.

REJECTED 1 WRIT AND 1 ABSTRACT W/CK#9244 AND 9243 MISSING L855. JUDGMENT AMOUNT INCORRECT ON BOTH. ABS, ITEM 1 AND 16 NEED TO BE COMPLETED. (ARS) (ARS)

REJECTED 1 WRIT AND 1 ABSTRACT W/CK#9244 AND 9243 MISSING L855. JUDGMENT AMOUNT INCORRECT ON BOTH. ABS, ITEM 1 AND 16 NEED TO BE COMPLETED. (ARS) (ARS)

JUDGMENT FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC; LEE & ASSOCIATES-ORANGE INC ON 01/18/2008

JUDGMENT FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC; LEE & ASSOCIATES-ORANGE INC ON 01/18/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL 01/18/2008 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL 01/18/2008 09:00:00 AM.

CASE REASSIGNED TO POLOS,PETER EFFECTIVE 01/28/2008.

CASE REASSIGNED TO POLOS,PETER EFFECTIVE 01/28/2008.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 01/18/2008 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 01/18/2008 10:00:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC ON 01/23/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC ON 01/23/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL 01/07/2008 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL 01/07/2008 09:00:00 AM.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRESPONDENCE SUBMITTED BY HOROWITZ, BRIAN REJECTED ON 09/20/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC; LEE & ASSOCIATES-ORANGE INC ON 07/26/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED (RIVERSIDE COUNTY) FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC; LEE & ASSOCIATES-ORANGE INC ON 06/08/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC; LEE & ASSOCIATES-ORANGE INC ON 02/06/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2008
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO COREY CRAMIN EFFECTIVE 04/17/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10082412 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 106779.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC ON 03/27/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION/POSSESSION/SALE (ORANGE) FILED BY NAI CAPITAL INC ON 03/27/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2008
  • WRIT ISSUED FOR ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION/POSSESSION/SALE SUBMITTED BY NAI CAPITAL INC REJECTED ON 03/13/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
501 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY BRIAN HOROWITZ ON 01/27/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY BRIAN HOROWITZ ON 01/26/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY BRIAN HOROWITZ ON 01/26/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTED) WAS FILED BY BRIAN HOROWITZ ON 01/26/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY BRIAN HOROWITZ ON 01/19/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY BRIAN HOROWITZ ON 01/19/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY BRIAN HOROWITZ ON 01/19/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2005
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET) WAS FILED BY BRIAN HOROWITZ ON 01/06/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2005
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY BRIAN HOROWITZ ON 01/06/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2005
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 01/06/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST CAPITAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ZUGSMITH TRUSTEE OF THE ZUGSMITH FAMILY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where NAI CAPITAL INCORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where LEE & ASSOCIATES COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC.-CITY OF INDUSTRY is a litigant