Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/01/2018 at 13:25:13 (UTC).

HERBERT SILVERBERG VS. CLARIENT, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2010 HERBERT SILVERBERG filed an Other lawsuit against CLARIENT, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Interested Parties

BABAK SOHRABIAN

HERBERT SILVERBERG

FRANK SIGL

BENJAMIN GREENBLATT

SOUTHWEST OHIO REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS PENSION PLAN

Defendants

STEPHEN T. ZARILLI

JAMES DATIN

PETER J. BONI

RONALD A. ANDREWS JR

OAK INVESTMENT PARTNERS

DENNIS H. SMITH JR

ANDREW W. ADAMS

FRANK P. SLATTERY JR

ANDREW ADAMS

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

ANN LAMONT

CRANE MERGER SUB, INC.

CLARIENT, INC.

FRANK SLATTERY

DENIIS M. SMITH

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GLANCY BINKOW & GOLDBERG, LLP

ABRAHAM FRUCHTER & TWERSKY, LLP

ROBBINS GELLER RUDMAN & DOWD LLP

FINKELSTEIN THOMPSON, LLP

SAXENA WHITE, PA

ROBBINS GELLER RUDMAN & DOWD, LLP

Defendant Attorney

LATHAM & WATKINS, LLP

Other Attorneys

LEVI & KORSINSKY, LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10958766 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10782658.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10958766 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10782658.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF DAVID T. WISSBROECKER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES) FILED BY HAEGE, DOLPH; SASSONE, MICHAEL; SIGL, FRANK; SOHRABIAN, BABAK; SIGL, FRANK; SOUTHWEST OHIO REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS PENSION PLAN; BENJAMIN GREENBLATT ON 07/01/2011

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF DAVID T. WISSBROECKER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES) FILED BY HAEGE, DOLPH; SASSONE, MICHAEL; SIGL, FRANK; SOHRABIAN, BABAK; SIGL, FRANK; SOUTHWEST OHIO REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS PENSION PLAN; BENJAMIN GREENBLATT ON 07/01/2011

NOTICE - OTHER (OF MINUTE ORDERS) FILED BY ADAMS, ANDREW; ANDREWS, RONALD A.; BONI, PETER J.; DATIN, JAMES A.; LAMONT, ANN H.; SLATTERY, FRANK P. JR; SMITH, DENNIS H. JR; WALLER, GREGORY D.; ZARILLI, STEPHEN T.; CLARIENT, INC. ON 02/22/2011

NOTICE - OTHER (OF MINUTE ORDERS) FILED BY ADAMS, ANDREW; ANDREWS, RONALD A.; BONI, PETER J.; DATIN, JAMES A.; LAMONT, ANN H.; SLATTERY, FRANK P. JR; SMITH, DENNIS H. JR; WALLER, GREGORY D.; ZARILLI, STEPHEN T.; CLARIENT, INC. ON 02/22/2011

REQUEST - OTHER (AND ORDER, PROPOSED) RECEIVED ON 11/18/2010.

REQUEST - OTHER (AND ORDER, PROPOSED) RECEIVED ON 11/18/2010.

PROOF OF SERVICE RECEIVED ON 11/12/2010.

PROOF OF SERVICE RECEIVED ON 11/12/2010.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LIMITED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY) FILED BY SOHRABIAN, BABAK ON 11/10/2010

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LIMITED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY) FILED BY SOHRABIAN, BABAK ON 11/10/2010

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/04/2010 11:22:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/04/2010 11:22:00 AM.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY CLARIENT, INC. ON 11/03/2010

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY CLARIENT, INC. ON 11/03/2010

COMPLAINT FILED BY SOHRABIAN, BABAK ON 10/29/2010

COMPLAINT FILED BY SOHRABIAN, BABAK ON 10/29/2010

ORDER - OTHER (CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS) FILED BY CLARIENT, INC.; ADAMS, ANDREW; ANDREWS, RONALD A.; BONI, PETER J.; DATIN, JAMES A.; LAMONT, ANN H.; SLATTERY, FRANK P. JR; SMITH, DENNIS M. JR; WALLER, GREGORY D.; ZARRILLI, STEPHEN T. ON 11/17/2010

ORDER - OTHER (CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS) FILED BY CLARIENT, INC.; ADAMS, ANDREW; ANDREWS, RONALD A.; BONI, PETER J.; DATIN, JAMES A.; LAMONT, ANN H.; SLATTERY, FRANK P. JR; SMITH, DENNIS M. JR; WALLER, GREGORY D.; ZARRILLI, STEPHEN T. ON 11/17/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10771334 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10595226.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10771334 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10595226.

MOTION - OTHER (FOR LIMITED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY) RECEIVED ON 11/10/2010.

MOTION - OTHER (FOR LIMITED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY) RECEIVED ON 11/10/2010.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10771314 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10595206.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10771314 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10595206.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR LIMITED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY) RECEIVED ON 11/10/2010.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR LIMITED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY) RECEIVED ON 11/10/2010.

MOTION FOR JOINDER RECEIVED ON 11/10/2010.

MOTION FOR JOINDER RECEIVED ON 11/10/2010.

APPENDIX OF AUTHORITIES FILED BY CRANE MERGER SUB, INC. ON 11/12/2010

APPENDIX OF AUTHORITIES FILED BY CRANE MERGER SUB, INC. ON 11/12/2010

STIPULATION AND ORDER (PROPOSED) RECEIVED ON 11/10/2010.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (PROPOSED) RECEIVED ON 11/10/2010.

179 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2011
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BENJAMIN GREENBLATT; HAEGE, DOLPH; SASSONE, MICHAEL; SIGL, FRANK; SILVERBERG, HERBERT; SOHRABIAN, BABAK; SOUTHWEST OHIO REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS PENSION PLAN ON 09/13/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION) FILED BY SILVERBERG, HERBERT; HAEGE, DOLPH; SASSONE, MICHAEL; SIGL, FRANK; SOHRABIAN, BABAK; SOUTHWEST OHIO REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS PENSION PLAN; BENJAMIN GREENBLATT ON 09/06/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
295 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2010
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 216672 RECEIVED ON 11/08/2010 11:40:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY CLARIENT, INC. ON 11/03/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 216208 RECEIVED ON 11/03/2010 03:56:41 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SILVERBERG, HERBERT ON 10/27/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 215240 RECEIVED ON 10/27/2010 11:38:39 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER STOCK, NANCY ON 10/25/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 166 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 945.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10757879 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10581771.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SILVERBERG, HERBERT ON 10/25/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SILVERBERG, HERBERT ON 10/25/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 215047 RECEIVED ON 10/25/2010 04:38:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Electric International Operations Company, Inc. is a litigant