This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/16/2016 at 10:31:56 (UTC).

HASE VS JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING II

Case Summary

On 07/28/2005 HASE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING II. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8657

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2005

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JACKSON HASE

JENI HASE

VALERIE D WELLS

JASON HASE

KELLI FERBER

JETTA HASE

TABER A WELLS BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARD

SONORA A WELLS BY AND THROUGH HER GUAR

MELISSA WELCH

FLINT STANLEY

Defendant

ALLIANCE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ACCI CORPORATION

EMPIRE LEASING INC

CLEAR VIEW WINDOWS & DOORS INC

SOUTHWEST V-DITCH INC

J.D. YOUNG CONSTRUCTION

WORLD OF AWNINGS & CANOPIES

PACIFIC CARPETS INC

THE PATTERSON COMPANY, INC

NATIONAL ROOFING COUNSULTANTS INC

71 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINK, ROBERT S-LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

MORROW & WHITE

Cross Defendant Attorneys

GRAY, YORK & DUFFY, LLP

KRUTCIK & GEORGGIN

CLARK, NOLAN E.: LAW OFFICES OF

Other Attorneys

WEIL & DRAGE, APC

THAGARD & REISS LLP

SILVER, CRAIG J: LAW OFFICES OF

MARSHALL FRENCH & DEGRAVE

LYDIA BOUZAGLOU-NEWCOMB-LAW OFFICES OF

JEFFERY & GROSFELD LLP

LONG, WILLIAMSON & DELIS

VAIL MACRAE & EDRINGTON

BROWNWOOD CHAZEN AND CANNON

DALE BRADEN & HINCHCLIFFE

ANNE MARIE HEALY-LAW OFFICES OF

STRINGHAM HILLMAN & LEW

HINES SMITH CARDER DINCEL BLAND

ALPERT BARR & GRANT

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA LLP

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 2009-10-26 09:00:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 2009-10-26 09:00:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 08/17/2009 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 08/17/2009 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER (OF OSC HEARING RE DISMISSAL) FILED BY ACCI CORPORATION ON 08/11/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF OSC HEARING RE DISMISSAL) FILED BY ACCI CORPORATION ON 08/11/2009

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (OF ENTIRE CASE) FILED BY ACCI CORPORATION ON 07/22/2009

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (OF ENTIRE CASE) FILED BY ACCI CORPORATION ON 07/22/2009

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR VOLUNTARY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 07/14/2009 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR VOLUNTARY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 07/14/2009 01:30:00 PM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACCI CORPORATION ON 06/29/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACCI CORPORATION ON 06/29/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY NATIONAL ROOFING COUNSULTANTS INC ON 06/18/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY NATIONAL ROOFING COUNSULTANTS INC ON 06/18/2009

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY NATIONAL ROOFING COUNSULTANTS INC ON 06/11/2009

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY NATIONAL ROOFING COUNSULTANTS INC ON 06/11/2009

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (AND APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY NATIONAL ROOFING COUNSULTANTS INC ON 05/05/2009

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (AND APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY NATIONAL ROOFING COUNSULTANTS INC ON 05/05/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACCI CORPORATION ON 06/05/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACCI CORPORATION ON 06/05/2009

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 06/05/2009 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 06/05/2009 09:00:00 AM.

REQUEST - OTHER (TO SET ORDER TO SHOW CASE RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT) FILED BY JAMBOREE TAL HOUSING I; JOHN STEWART COMPANY-THE ON 01/21/2009

REQUEST - OTHER (TO SET ORDER TO SHOW CASE RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT) FILED BY JAMBOREE TAL HOUSING I; JOHN STEWART COMPANY-THE ON 01/21/2009

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2009-05-04 09:00:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2009-05-04 09:00:00.0.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (COMPLAINT DISMISSED AS TO CASE NO 05CC09178) FILED BY STANLEY, FLINT ON 05/01/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (COMPLAINT DISMISSED AS TO CASE NO 05CC09178) FILED BY STANLEY, FLINT ON 05/01/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (COMPLAINT DISMISSED) FILED BY HASE, JASON; HASE, JENI; HASE, JACKSON; HASE, JETTA ON 05/01/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (COMPLAINT DISMISSED) FILED BY HASE, JASON; HASE, JENI; HASE, JACKSON; HASE, JETTA ON 05/01/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (COMPLAINT) FILED BY WELCH, MELISSA ON 05/01/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (COMPLAINT) FILED BY WELCH, MELISSA ON 05/01/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (COMPLAINT FILED BY KELLI FERBER & NICOLE MARINO AS TO CASE # 06CC02577) FILED BY FERBER, KELLI ON 05/01/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (COMPLAINT FILED BY KELLI FERBER & NICOLE MARINO AS TO CASE # 06CC02577) FILED BY FERBER, KELLI ON 05/01/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (COMPLAINT DISMISSED) FILED BY WELLS, VALERIE D ON 05/01/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (COMPLAINT DISMISSED) FILED BY WELLS, VALERIE D ON 05/01/2009

98 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 2009-10-26 09:00:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 08/17/2009 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 10/26/2009 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (OF OSC HEARING RE DISMISSAL) FILED BY ACCI CORPORATION ON 08/11/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (OF ENTIRE CASE) FILED BY ACCI CORPORATION ON 07/22/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR VOLUNTARY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 07/14/2009 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACCI CORPORATION ON 06/29/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY NATIONAL ROOFING COUNSULTANTS INC ON 06/18/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
362 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) WAS FILED BY JASON HASE ON 12/13/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2005
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (REQUEST/DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) WAS FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING II ON 11/23/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2005
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT/PETITION) WAS FILED BY JAMBOREE-TAL HOUSING II ON 11/23/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY JASON HASE ON 09/30/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2005
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 08/09/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (APPLICATION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM) WAS FILED BY JASON HASE ON 07/28/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (APPLICATION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM) WAS FILED BY JASON HASE ON 07/28/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET) WAS FILED BY JASON HASE ON 07/28/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY JASON HASE ON 07/28/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 07/28/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCC AND ASSOCIATES INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC CARPETS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ACCI INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHWEST V-DITCH, INC. is a litigant