This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/02/2016 at 08:30:02 (UTC).

HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION II INC VS MERRILL LYNCH & CO

Case Summary

On 05/15/2007 HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION II INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MERRILL LYNCH CO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5937

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION II, INC

CHARLES HARTWELL

HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION II INC

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

A.G. PLASTERING & DRYWALL, INC

NEWPORT ROOFING, INC.

ELDRIDGE BUILDERS, INC.

AMEN WARDY JR

SIERRA PACIFIC WINDOWS, A DIVISION OF SIERRA PACIFIC INDUSTRIES

HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION, II

HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION II, INC

INSUL-FLOW, INC.

CHARLES HARTWELL

AMEN WARDY

SZEMENYEI CONSTRUCTION, INC.

BOB ELECTRIC, INC.

HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION II INC

COMBE INDUSTRIES, INC

FAST & FURIOUS CUSTOM SHEET METAL

MONARCH DECKING, INC.

ARMEN WARDY

GREENLEAF DEMOLITION AND GRADING

GARY SENGLE

BREA CANYON INSULATION, INC.

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN LLP

ERIC MICHAEL PAPP-LAW OFFICES OF

WILLIAM C KERSTEN

Cross Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER P. RUIZ, APLC

SPRINGEL & FINK LLP

LAW OFFICES OF JOSHUA B. VINOGRAD, PC

RUS MILIBAND & SMITH APC

DUN & MARTINEK LLP

HAFFNER, HAFFNER & KIRWIN LLP

WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN LLP

ERIC MICHAEL PAPP-LAW OFFICES OF

WILKINS DROLSHAGEN & CZESHINSKI LLP

HORTON OBERRECHT KIRKPATRICK & MARTHA

COCHRAN DAVIS & ASSOCIATES PC

WILLIAM C KERSTEN

VANDERFORD & RUIZ LLP

LAW OFFICE OF STERLING S. HATHAWAY

CRAWFORD & BANGS, LLP

Other Attorneys

VON ESCH & VON ESCH

LAW OFFICES OF PEGAN & FRASER

MARSHALL, FRENCH & DEGRAVE

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

LAW OFFICES OF LINDA M LIBERTUCCI

 

Court Documents

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY ATLAS SHEET METAL, INC. ON 04/25/2012

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY ATLAS SHEET METAL, INC. ON 04/25/2012

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/22/2012.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/22/2012.

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY WARDY JR, AMEN ON 01/20/2012

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY WARDY JR, AMEN ON 01/20/2012

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF CHARLES HARTWELL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION) FILED BY HARTWELL, CHARLES; HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION II INC ON 12/09/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF CHARLES HARTWELL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION) FILED BY HARTWELL, CHARLES; HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION II INC ON 12/09/2011

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/27/2011.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/27/2011.

NOTICE - OTHER (OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE) FILED BY BOB ELECTRIC, INC. ON 01/07/2011

NOTICE - OTHER (OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE) FILED BY BOB ELECTRIC, INC. ON 01/07/2011

ORDER - OTHER (OF DISMISSAL FROM CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY HARDWOOD CENTER ON 12/09/2010

ORDER - OTHER (OF DISMISSAL FROM CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY HARDWOOD CENTER ON 12/09/2010

MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY HARDWOOD CENTER ON 10/06/2010

MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY HARDWOOD CENTER ON 10/06/2010

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY HARTWELL, CHARLES ON 03/09/2010

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY HARTWELL, CHARLES ON 03/09/2010

NOTICE - OTHER (OF STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY HARTWELL, CHARLES ON 07/24/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY HARTWELL, CHARLES ON 07/24/2009

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION II INC ON 07/16/2009

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION II INC ON 07/16/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF COMPLEX TAX FEE) FILED BY INSUL-FLOW, INC. ON 05/27/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF COMPLEX TAX FEE) FILED BY INSUL-FLOW, INC. ON 05/27/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF COMPLEX TAX FEE) FILED BY ELDRIDGE BUILDERS, INC. ON 05/21/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF COMPLEX TAX FEE) FILED BY ELDRIDGE BUILDERS, INC. ON 05/21/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 550.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10384497 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10208371.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 550.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10384497 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10208371.

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF ORDER) FILED BY HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION II INC ON 05/18/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF ORDER) FILED BY HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION II INC ON 05/18/2009

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ELDRIDGE BUILDERS, INC. ON 04/10/2009

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ELDRIDGE BUILDERS, INC. ON 04/10/2009

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED ON 02/13/2009

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED ON 02/13/2009

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL GENERATED

621 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2012
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (OF TAKING THE MOTION TO STRIKE/TAX COSTS OFF CALENDAR) FILED BY A.G. PLASTERING & DRYWALL, INC ON 12/18/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 131282 RECEIVED ON 12/17/2012 04:50:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY ABOVE IT ALL CONTRUCTION ON 12/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 130042 RECEIVED ON 12/06/2012 03:40:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING (MOTION FOR AN ORDER SETTING ASIDE JUDGMENT AND PERMITTING A.G. PLASTERING & DRYWALL, INC. TO FILE A MOTION TO TAX OR STRIKE THE COSTS) FILED BY A.G. PLASTERING & DRYWALL, INC ON 12/03/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT 2012-11-30 09:00:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2012
  • MOTION TO TAX COSTS SCHEDULED FOR 01/18/2013 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX105 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11274246 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11098138.

    Read MoreRead Less
966 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2007
  • OTHER ACTIONS (REJECTED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 07/12/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2007
  • ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ANSWER TO X/C, 1ST APPEARANCE FEE PAID PREVIOUSLY) WAS FILED BY HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION II, INC ON 07/05/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT (CROSS-COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED ON 07/02/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT/PETITION) WAS FILED BY MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED ON 07/02/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTED) WAS FILED BY HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION II INC ON 05/24/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION II INC ON 05/24/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION II INC ON 05/24/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2007
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION II INC ON 05/15/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2007
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY HARTWELL CONSTRUCTION II INC ON 05/15/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2007
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 05/15/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SZEMENYEI CONSTRUCTION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NEWPORT ROOFING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where INSUL-FLOW INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SIERRA PACIFIC WINDOWS is a litigant