This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/13/2017 at 07:16:39 (UTC).

HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION VS. GONZALES AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/12/2010 HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC , A CALFORNIA COPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GONZALES AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION

Defendant

GONZALES AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALEN & DAVIS, LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 18 - RETURNED CHECK FEE, 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10933071 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10756963.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 18 - RETURNED CHECK FEE, 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10933071 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10756963.

PAYMENT FOR 141 - WRIT, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10912989 IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00 VOIDED DUE TO NSF.

PAYMENT FOR 141 - WRIT, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10912989 IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00 VOIDED DUE TO NSF.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 05/20/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 05/20/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10912989 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10736881.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10912989 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10736881.

JUDGMENT FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 01/26/2011

JUDGMENT FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 01/26/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE ORAL CONTRACT) FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 01/06/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE ORAL CONTRACT) FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 01/06/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER (COURT RULE 366) FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 01/06/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER (COURT RULE 366) FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 01/06/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER (C.C.P. 1033) FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 01/06/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER (C.C.P. 1033) FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 01/06/2011

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 01/06/2011

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 01/06/2011

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 01/06/2011

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 01/06/2011

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 01/06/2011

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 01/06/2011

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION REJECTED ON 12/20/2010.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION REJECTED ON 12/20/2010.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/04/2011 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N18 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/04/2011 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N18 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 08/26/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 08/26/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 135 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K, 302 - OVERAGE FEE <= $10 IN THE AMOUNT OF 335.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10527509.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 135 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K, 302 - OVERAGE FEE <= $10 IN THE AMOUNT OF 335.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10527509.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 08/12/2010

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 08/12/2010

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 08/12/2010

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 08/12/2010

COMPLAINT FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 08/12/2010

COMPLAINT FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 08/12/2010

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM NORTH JUSTICE CENTER TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 18 - RETURNED CHECK FEE, 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10933071 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10756963.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • RETURNED CHECK NOTICE MAILED BY FISCAL SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT FOR 141 - WRIT, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10912989 IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00 VOIDED DUE TO NSF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED CHECK NOTICE OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 05/20/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10912989 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10736881.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • WRIT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/04/2011 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/08/2011 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT N18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/08/2011 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N18 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION REJECTED ON 12/20/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/04/2011 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N18 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 08/26/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 135 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K, 302 - OVERAGE FEE <= $10 IN THE AMOUNT OF 335.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10527509.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 08/12/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 08/12/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS, INC., A CALFORNIA COPORATION ON 08/12/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARTE-HANKS SHOPPERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GONZALES AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC. DBA CASA DE GONZALES CHRYSLER JEEP is a litigant