This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/15/2016 at 02:33:27 (UTC).

HARM VS HETMAN

Case Summary

On 03/09/2006 HARM filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HETMAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3911

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Respondent / Appellees

SORAYA MARIA HARM

JAMES MICHAEL HARM, AS TRUSTEE OF THE

SORAYA MARIA HARM, AS TRUSTEES OF THE

JAMES MICHAEL HARM

SORAYA MARIA HARM, AS TRUSTEES OF THE HARM FAMILY TRUST

JAMES MICHAEL HARM, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HARM FAMILY TRUST

ANTONIO ACEVES

AAG MASONRY

EUGENE CUCCARESE

JAMES MICHAEL HARM TRUSTEE OF THE HARM FAMILY LIVING TRUST U

SORAYA MARIA HARM TRUSTEE OF THE HARM FAMILY LIVING TRUST UT

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants, Appellants and Respondent / Appellees

JAMES MICHAEL HARM

WAYNE T HETMAN

Claimant

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD A. JONES

Defendants and Appellants

WAYNE T HETMAN

SORAYA MARIA HARM TRUSTEE OF THE HARM

JAMES MICHAEL HARM TRUSTEE OF THE HARM

Interested Parties

U.S. BANK

JANICE K. COLELLA

ROBERTA M BROWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant, Respondent / Appellee and Appellant Attorneys

DOSS AND PAGE

MAJID FOROOZANDEH

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD A. JONES

WILLIAM E KRALL JR

LAW OFFICES OF ANDREW D. WEISS

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF ANDREW D. WEISS

OUTWATER & PINCKES LLP

Interested Party and Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF M. CANDICE BRYNER

OUTWATER & PINCKES LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED

NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED

OPPOSITION FILED BY HARM, JAMES MICHAEL; HARM, SORAYA MARIA; HARM, JAMES MICHAEL; HARM, SORAYA MARIA ON 06/17/2015

OPPOSITION FILED BY HARM, JAMES MICHAEL; HARM, SORAYA MARIA; HARM, JAMES MICHAEL; HARM, SORAYA MARIA ON 06/17/2015

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T ON 05/18/2012

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T ON 05/18/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11085548 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10909440.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11085548 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10909440.

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE W/CRC RULE 8.140) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/09/2011

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE W/CRC RULE 8.140) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/09/2011

SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T ON 07/28/2010

SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T ON 07/28/2010

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY JAMES MICHAEL HARM TRUSTEE OF THE HARM FAMILY LIVING TRUST U ON 05/07/2010

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY JAMES MICHAEL HARM TRUSTEE OF THE HARM FAMILY LIVING TRUST U ON 05/07/2010

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF ELECTION TO PROCEED BY CRC RULE 8.124 W/OUT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/10/2010

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF ELECTION TO PROCEED BY CRC RULE 8.124 W/OUT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/10/2010

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 03/04/2010 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 03/04/2010 02:00:00 PM.

MOTION - OTHER (TO MODIFY INJUNCTION) FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T ON 01/25/2010

MOTION - OTHER (TO MODIFY INJUNCTION) FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T ON 01/25/2010

OBJECTION (UNTIMELY SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF RICHARD JONES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION) FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T ON 12/02/2009

OBJECTION (UNTIMELY SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF RICHARD JONES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION) FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T ON 12/02/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS ON APPEAL SUBMITTED BY HARM, JAMES MICHAEL; HARM, SORAYA MARIA REJECTED ON 09/09/2009.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS ON APPEAL SUBMITTED BY HARM, JAMES MICHAEL; HARM, SORAYA MARIA REJECTED ON 09/09/2009.

REMITTITUR -AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART- G039955

REMITTITUR -AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART- G039955

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 224 - REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT IN THE AMOUNT OF 3,365.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10163245 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 187611.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 224 - REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT IN THE AMOUNT OF 3,365.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10163245 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 187611.

NOTICE OF ELECTION TO PROCEED BY CRC RULE 8.124 W/NO REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT

NOTICE OF ELECTION TO PROCEED BY CRC RULE 8.124 W/NO REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE W/CRC RULE 8.140

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE W/CRC RULE 8.140

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10070140 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 94525.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10070140 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 94525.

368 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER G052336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER G052336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER G052336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER G052336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G052336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEAL - OTHER (NOTICE OF PROCEEDING WITHOUT ORAL RECORD) FILED BY HARM, JAMES MICHAEL ON 11/20/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEAL - OTHER (NOTICE OF BOARD REPORTER'S LETTER) FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T ON 11/12/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
754 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2006
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES) WAS FILED BY JAMES MICHAEL HARM ON 05/11/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE BY COUNSEL OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) WAS FILED BY WAYNE T HETMAN ON 04/25/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2006
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (CHANGE OF FIRM NAME) WAS FILED BY JAMES MICHAEL HARM ON 04/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 04/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 04/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2006
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY WAYNE T HETMAN ON 04/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY JAMES MICHAEL HARM ON 03/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY JAMES MICHAEL HARM ON 03/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY JAMES MICHAEL HARM ON 03/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 03/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less