This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/20/2016 at 04:55:37 (UTC).

GUNTHER VS STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 11/16/2005 GUNTHER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4693

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2005

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVID GUNTHER

Defendants and Respondents

32ND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL ASSOCIATION

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MORSE MEHRBAN-LAW OFFICES OF

LAW OFFICES OF MORSE MEHRBAN

MURTAUGH MEYER NELSON AND TREGLIA

 

Court Documents

REMITTITUR (JUDGMENT AND ORDER AFFIRMED) FILED BY GUNTHER, DAVID ON 01/14/2008

REMITTITUR (JUDGMENT AND ORDER AFFIRMED) FILED BY GUNTHER, DAVID ON 01/14/2008

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS (DEFENDANTS EXHIBITS, REMITTITUR)

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS (DEFENDANTS EXHIBITS, REMITTITUR)

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DESTROY EXHIBITS MAILED.

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DESTROY EXHIBITS MAILED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10282487 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10106362.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10282487 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10106362.

PAYMENT FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10282487 IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

PAYMENT FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10282487 IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10282572 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10106447.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10282572 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10106447.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2013
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10282572 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10106447.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10282487 IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10282487 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10106362.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2008
  • DocketEXHIBITS DESTROYED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO DESTROY EXHIBITS MAILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR RECORDS (DEFENDANTS EXHIBITS, REMITTITUR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREMITTITUR (JUDGMENT AND ORDER AFFIRMED) FILED BY GUNTHER, DAVID ON 01/14/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2007
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (COPY OF NOTICE OF FILING OF JUDGMENT/ORDER) FILED BY GUNTHER, DAVID ON 12/24/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2007
  • DocketDOCUMENT - OTHER (SPECIAL FILING SEE REMARKS) WAS FILED ON 09/18/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2007
  • DocketMINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 05/05/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2006
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) WAS FILED BY 32ND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL ASSOCIATION ON 04/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2006
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) WAS FILED BY DAVID GUNTHER ON 04/04/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2006
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 03/22/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2006
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER (STIPULATION AND ORDER) WAS FILED BY 32ND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL ASSOCIATION ON 02/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2005
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY DAVID GUNTHER ON 12/30/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2005
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY 32ND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL ASSOCIATION ON 12/28/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2005
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY DAVID GUNTHER ON 11/30/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2005
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY DAVID GUNTHER ON 11/16/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2005
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 11/16/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 32nd District Agricultural Association, A California State Institution is a litigant