This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/02/2016 at 10:41:23 (UTC).

GCFS INC VS TORRES

Case Summary

On 05/15/2001 GCFS INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against TORRES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2812

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2001

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GCFS INC

Defendant

JORGE TORRES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIGHTON HUSHING-KLINE

 

Court Documents

LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY GCFS INC ON 04/18/2008

LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY GCFS INC ON 04/18/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY GCFS INC ON 04/18/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY GCFS INC ON 04/18/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10102174 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 126541.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10102174 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 126541.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY GCFS INC ON 11/04/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY GCFS INC ON 11/04/2008

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GCFS INC ON 12/03/2008

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GCFS INC ON 12/03/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 43 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10271266 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10095141.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 43 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10271266 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10095141.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY GCFS INC ON 12/03/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY GCFS INC ON 12/03/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10271294 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10095169.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10271294 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10095169.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OF NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND APPLICATION FOR RENEWEAL OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY GCFS INC ON 01/30/2009

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OF NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND APPLICATION FOR RENEWEAL OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY GCFS INC ON 01/30/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY GCFS INC ON 02/13/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY GCFS INC ON 02/13/2009

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY GCFS INC ON 10/19/2009

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY GCFS INC ON 10/19/2009

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2012
  • DocketTRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY GCFS INC ON 10/19/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY GCFS INC ON 02/13/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OF NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND APPLICATION FOR RENEWEAL OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY GCFS INC ON 01/30/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10271294 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10095169.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2008
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY GCFS INC ON 12/03/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 43 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10271266 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10095141.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GCFS INC ON 12/03/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY GCFS INC ON 11/04/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10102174 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 126541.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2008
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION-MONTEREY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY GCFS INC ON 04/18/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2001
  • DocketCOURT ENTERS JUDGMENT FOR GCFS INC IN THE AMOUNT OF 1417.50 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST TORRES, JORGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2001
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY GCFS INC ON 04/18/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2008
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GCFS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUSHING-KLINE BRIGHTON KILIAN