This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/16/2016 at 09:01:07 (UTC).

GCFS, INC. V THOMSON

Case Summary

On 04/18/2006 GCFS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THOMSON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1689

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GCFS, INC.

Defendant

THOMAS THOMSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GILBERT WILKES IV

LEGAL DEPARTMENT OF GCFS, INC.

Defendant Attorney

HAROLD V. MESICK

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11932457 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11756642.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11932457 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11756642.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 3/8/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 3/8/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY GCFS, INC. ON 03/03/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY GCFS, INC. ON 03/03/2016

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GCFS, INC. ON 02/16/2016

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GCFS, INC. ON 02/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY GCFS, INC. ON 02/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY GCFS, INC. ON 02/16/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11902737 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11726954.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11902737 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11726954.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 1/8/16) RECEIVED ON 01/07/2016.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 1/8/16) RECEIVED ON 01/07/2016.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/07/2016

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/07/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/07/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/07/2016

REQUEST - OTHER (TO TAKE OJD OFF CALENDAR) FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 07/05/2011

REQUEST - OTHER (TO TAKE OJD OFF CALENDAR) FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 07/05/2011

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 06/22/2011 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 06/22/2011 08:30:00 AM.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (AMENDED PROOF FOR OJD & SUBPOENA) FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 05/18/2011

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (AMENDED PROOF FOR OJD & SUBPOENA) FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 05/18/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10876630 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10700522.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10876630 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10700522.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 04/12/2011

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 04/12/2011

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 10/19/2009

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 10/19/2009

DECLARATION - OTHER (CALCULATION OF POST JUDGMENT INTEREST) FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 03/16/2009

DECLARATION - OTHER (CALCULATION OF POST JUDGMENT INTEREST) FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 03/16/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS REJECTED

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS REJECTED

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 08/19/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 08/19/2008

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11932457 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11756642.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 3/8/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY GCFS, INC. ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3387318 RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016 12:37:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GCFS, INC. ON 02/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY GCFS, INC. ON 02/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3380878 RECEIVED ON 02/12/2016 02:35:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11902737 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11726954.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 1/8/16) RECEIVED ON 01/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 07/10/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2006
  • REQUEST - OTHER (REQUEST - OTHER) WAS FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 07/10/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 06/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 06/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 06/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 06/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 05/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 04/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 04/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 04/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GCFS INC. is a litigant