This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/10/2016 at 06:28:40 (UTC).

FRENCH VS COLLINS

Case Summary

On 10/10/2001 FRENCH filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against COLLINS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6119

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2001

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEGGY FRENCH

Defendants

BREN HEWITT

ERIN COLLINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN D SILVERSTEIN

 

Court Documents

LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 06/03/2010

LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 06/03/2010

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 04/23/2010

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 04/23/2010

REJECTED WRIT OF EXECUTION.

REJECTED WRIT OF EXECUTION.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10510418.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10510418.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 01/21/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 01/21/2011

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 09/08/2011

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 09/08/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11027693 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10851585.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11027693 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10851585.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 09/08/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 09/08/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 11/21/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 11/21/2011

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 11/21/2011

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 11/21/2011

AFFIDAVIT OF IDENTITY AND ORDER FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 06/15/2012

AFFIDAVIT OF IDENTITY AND ORDER FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 06/15/2012

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 06/05/2012

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 06/05/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11168313 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10992205.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11168313 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10992205.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 04/01/2016

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 04/01/2016

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 04/01/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2012
  • DocketTRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11168313 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10992205.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 06/05/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF IDENTITY AND ORDER FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 06/15/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 11/21/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 11/21/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 09/08/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 01/21/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10510418.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2010
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREJECTED WRIT OF EXECUTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 04/23/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2001
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2001
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2001
  • DocketTHE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FOR FRENCH, PEGGY IN THE AMOUNT OF 1330.00 PRINCIPAL, 270.00 COSTS AND 350.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST COLLINS, ERIN ;HEWITT, BREN .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY FRENCH, PEGGY ON 06/03/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2001
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven D. Silverstein