This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/06/2017 at 10:15:03 (UTC).

FRED MAGHAMI VS. 'R' ESCROW

Case Summary

On 10/28/2009 FRED MAGHAMI filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 'R' ESCROW. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

FRED MAGHAMI

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CINDY CHAO

HAUNG WANBING

YOU CHANG CHEN

CINDY CHAU

KENNETH BRYANT

MARIA T. HERRERA

PINEAPPLE JOE

HUANG WANBIN

THE WOK EXPERIENCE INC.

MARK ONE

THE WOK EXPERIENCE RIVERSIDE

MILLIE CORK

Cross Defendants

CONNOISSEUR CORPORATION

JOHN TE

INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

BOARD OF EQUALIZATION

OLIVER MAGHAMI

OLI MAGHAMI

MARK ONE

FRED MAGHAMI

ANAHEIM RESORT RESTAURANT

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF M.T. HERRERA

CHARLES H. MANH PC

JULANDER BROWN & BOLLARD

BRYANT & BRYANT

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR TERMINATION OF SANCTIONS 02/04/2011 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR TERMINATION OF SANCTIONS 02/04/2011 01:30:00 PM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY R ESCROW ON 11/10/2010

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY R ESCROW ON 11/10/2010

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 09/23/2010 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 09/23/2010 08:30:00 AM.

OPPOSITION (OF R ESCROW AND MILLIE CORK TO EX PARTE APPLICATION) FILED BY CORK, MILLIE; R ESCROW ON 09/01/2010

OPPOSITION (OF R ESCROW AND MILLIE CORK TO EX PARTE APPLICATION) FILED BY CORK, MILLIE; R ESCROW ON 09/01/2010

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 09/02/2010 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 09/02/2010 08:45:00 AM.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS) FILED BY MAGHAMI, FRED ON 08/27/2010

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS) FILED BY MAGHAMI, FRED ON 08/27/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10539695.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10539695.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10537587.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10537587.

MOTION - OTHER (TERMINATING SANCTIONS) FILED BY MAGHAMI, FRED ON 08/25/2010

MOTION - OTHER (TERMINATING SANCTIONS) FILED BY MAGHAMI, FRED ON 08/25/2010

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/05/2010 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/05/2010 08:45:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 80.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10522054.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 80.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10522054.

DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (AND MOTION TO STRIKE) FILED BY MAGHAMI, FRED ON 08/05/2010

DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (AND MOTION TO STRIKE) FILED BY MAGHAMI, FRED ON 08/05/2010

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (TO STRIKE AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY MAGHAMI, FRED ON 08/03/2010

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (TO STRIKE AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY MAGHAMI, FRED ON 08/03/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10519941.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10519941.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/02/2010 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/02/2010 08:45:00 AM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY R ESCROW; CORK, MILLIE ON 07/27/2010

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY R ESCROW; CORK, MILLIE ON 07/27/2010

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 'R' ESCROW INC ON 07/29/2010

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 'R' ESCROW INC ON 07/29/2010

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR ORDER CLARIFYING COURT'S RULING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT) FILED BY MAGHAMI, FRED ON 07/29/2010

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR ORDER CLARIFYING COURT'S RULING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT) FILED BY MAGHAMI, FRED ON 07/29/2010

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR TERMINATION OF SANCTIONS 02/04/2011 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • DocketAMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY R ESCROW ON 11/10/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 09/23/2010 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSITION (OF R ESCROW AND MILLIE CORK TO EX PARTE APPLICATION) FILED BY CORK, MILLIE; R ESCROW ON 09/01/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 09/02/2010 08:45:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • DocketJURY TRIAL CONTINUED TO 03/28/2011 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/28/2011 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • DocketJURY TRIAL RESCHEDULED FOR 03/28/2011 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
120 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 4) FILED BY MAGHAMI, FRED ON 11/02/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 3) FILED BY MAGHAMI, FRED ON 11/02/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) FILED BY MAGHAMI, FRED ON 11/02/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY MAGHAMI, FRED ON 11/02/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MAGHAMI, FRED ON 10/30/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 133- COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 355.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10499494 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10323367.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW ON 10/28/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MAGHAMI, FRED ON 10/28/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MAGHAMI, FRED ON 10/28/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MAGHAMI, FRED ON 10/28/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Internal Revenue Service is a litigant