This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/13/2016 at 03:43:03 (UTC).

FRED GONZALES VS. HIGHLAND ENGINEERING OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2008 FRED GONZALES filed an Other lawsuit against HIGHLAND ENGINEERING OF CALIFORNIA, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2008

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRED GONZALES

Defendants

HIGHLAND ENGINEERING OF CALIFORNIA, IN

HIGHLAND ENGINEERING, LLC

HIGHLAND ENGINEERING OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FEERICK & ASSOCIATES

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT A WALLER, JR.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GONZALES, FRED ON 03/27/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GONZALES, FRED ON 03/27/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 4.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10345698 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10169572.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 4.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10345698 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10169572.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 03/17/2009 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 03/17/2009 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING 01/02/2009 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING 01/02/2009 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 12/29/2008 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 12/29/2008 08:45:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT WITH JUDGMENT PACKAGE) SUBMITTED BY GONZALES, FRED REJECTED ON 11/03/2008.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT WITH JUDGMENT PACKAGE) SUBMITTED BY GONZALES, FRED REJECTED ON 11/03/2008.

MEMORANDUM FOR SETTING FOR HEARING FILED BY GONZALES, FRED ON 11/03/2008

MEMORANDUM FOR SETTING FOR HEARING FILED BY GONZALES, FRED ON 11/03/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 31.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10238094 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10061969.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 31.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10238094 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10061969.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 10/27/2008 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 10/27/2008 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 10/21/2008 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 10/21/2008 08:45:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 4.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10210113 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10033988.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 4.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10210113 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10033988.

PROOF OF SERVICE (BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE) FILED BY GONZALES, FRED ON 09/24/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE (BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE) FILED BY GONZALES, FRED ON 09/24/2008

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/09/2008 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/09/2008 08:45:00 AM.

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY GONZALES, FRED ON 08/01/2008

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY GONZALES, FRED ON 08/01/2008

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GONZALES, FRED ON 08/01/2008

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GONZALES, FRED ON 08/01/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 2.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10168429 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 192795.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 2.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10168429 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 192795.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GONZALES, FRED ON 07/28/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GONZALES, FRED ON 07/28/2008

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2009
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GONZALES, FRED ON 03/27/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 4.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10345698 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10169572.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 03/17/2009 08:45:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE CONTINUED TO 06/30/2009 AT 08:45 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 06/30/2009 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE RESCHEDULED FOR 06/30/2009 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING 01/02/2009 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 12/29/2008 08:45:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2008
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL CONTINUED TO 03/17/2009 AT 08:45 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 11.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10127895 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 152261.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GONZALES, FRED ON 06/02/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GONZALES, FRED ON 06/02/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 6.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10127804 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 152170.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 10.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10127586 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 151952.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 26 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 332.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10055441 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 79848.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DIDIER, DANIEL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GONZALES, FRED ON 02/14/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GONZALES, FRED ON 02/14/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY GONZALES, FRED ON 02/14/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less