This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/29/2016 at 03:58:07 (UTC).

FORD VS DHEAFI

Case Summary

On 10/24/2006 FORD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DHEAFI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4571

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY

Defendants

SHANNON R RAMIREZ

AHMAD F DHEAFI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACDOWELL AND ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12035863 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11859868.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12035863 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11859868.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/26/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/26/2016

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 9/27/16) RECEIVED ON 09/26/2016.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 9/27/16) RECEIVED ON 09/26/2016.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/26/2016

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11317530 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11141422.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11317530 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11141422.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY; FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/07/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY; FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/07/2013

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 01/23/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 01/23/2008

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12035863 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11859868.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 9/27/16) RECEIVED ON 09/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4611514 RECEIVED ON 09/26/2016 04:31:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11317530 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11141422.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY; FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/07/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2200992 RECEIVED ON 02/07/2013 01:00:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2007
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED ON 03/08/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2007
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2007
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED ON 02/15/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 01/24/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2007
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 01/24/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 11/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 11/16/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 10/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.