This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/10/2016 at 05:01:22 (UTC).

FORD V VERA

Case Summary

On 09/03/2004 FORD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VERA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4148

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY

Defendants

MARIE E VASQUEZ

ROBERTO F VERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REESE LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/15/2014

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/15/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 10/15/14) RECEIVED ON 10/15/2014.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 10/15/14) RECEIVED ON 10/15/2014.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/15/2014

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/15/2014

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/15/2014

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/15/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/15/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/15/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/15/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/15/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11675333 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11499478.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11675333 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11499478.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/20/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/20/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/20/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/20/2014

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/20/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/20/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4264774 RECEIVED ON 10/20/2014 07:41:41 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11675333 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11499478.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/15/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/15/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/15/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/15/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 10/15/14) RECEIVED ON 10/15/2014.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/15/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2004
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 12/27/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2004
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 12/21/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2004
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 12/21/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2004
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 12/21/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2004
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/O PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 12/21/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2004
  • DocketOTHER ACTIONS (REJECTED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 12/09/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2004
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE (CERTIFICATE OF DUE DILIGENCE) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/16/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2004
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED TO SUMMONS) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/16/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2004
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 09/03/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2004
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/03/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant