Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/14/2016 at 11:40:58 (UTC).

FORD V VANBUREN

Case Summary

On 03/06/2006 FORD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VANBUREN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1014

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY

Defendant

CHERIE VANBUREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REESE LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CO

REESE LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 11/22/2013

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 11/22/2013

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/30/2013

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/30/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11134960 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10958852.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11134960 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10958852.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 04/11/2012

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 04/11/2012

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 12/19/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 12/19/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED (CCP 706.026) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/31/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED (CCP 706.026) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/31/2011

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (INTEREST) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/16/2011

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (INTEREST) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/16/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/16/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/16/2011

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (AND ADDRESS) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/16/2011

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (AND ADDRESS) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/16/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10908826 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10732718.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10908826 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10732718.

WRIT SUBMITTED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY REJECTED ON 05/05/2011.

WRIT SUBMITTED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY REJECTED ON 05/05/2011.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 11/22/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/30/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 365625 RECEIVED ON 09/30/2013 02:45:44 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11134960 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10958852.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • WRIT ISSUED LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 04/11/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 12/19/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED (CCP 706.026) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/31/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (INTEREST) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/16/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 04/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2006
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 04/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 04/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2006
  • REQUEST - OTHER (REQUEST - OTHER) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 04/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 04/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/22/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 03/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant