This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/27/2016 at 11:19:52 (UTC).

FORD V DUTEAU

Case Summary

On 01/04/2006 FORD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DUTEAU. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0017

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY

Defendant

GREGORY D DUTEAU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACDOWELL AND ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11923256 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11747453.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11923256 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11747453.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/16/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/16/2016

WRIT (ISSUED 2/19/16) RECEIVED ON 02/16/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 2/19/16) RECEIVED ON 02/16/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/16/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11844584 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11668832.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11844584 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11668832.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/08/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/08/2015

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 9/9/15) RECEIVED ON 09/08/2015.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 9/9/15) RECEIVED ON 09/08/2015.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/08/2015

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/08/2015

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11923256 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11747453.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 2/19/16) RECEIVED ON 02/16/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1304754 RECEIVED ON 02/12/2016 09:50:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11844584 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11668832.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/08/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 9/9/15) RECEIVED ON 09/08/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/08/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3328666 RECEIVED ON 09/08/2015 03:13:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2006
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED ON 04/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2006
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED ON 04/05/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 01/04/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 01/04/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 01/04/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.