This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/29/2016 at 06:03:29 (UTC).

FORD V DEANER

Case Summary

On 11/01/2006 FORD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DEANER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5024

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY

Defendants

KAREN L DEANER

ROSS M DEANER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REESE LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CO

REESE LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/02/2009

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/02/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 07/01/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 07/01/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10365423 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10189297.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10365423 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10189297.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/09/2009

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/09/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/09/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/09/2009

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/09/2009

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/09/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 11/26/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 11/26/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10115445 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 139811.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10115445 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 139811.

DECLARATION - OTHER (INTEREST) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/14/2008

DECLARATION - OTHER (INTEREST) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/14/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/09/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/09/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/11/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/11/2008

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/02/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 07/01/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10365423 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10189297.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • WRIT ISSUED FOR ORANGE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/09/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/09/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/09/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 11/26/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10115445 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 139811.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/16/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2007
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/16/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2007
  • REQUEST - OTHER (REQUEST - OTHER) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/16/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 02/06/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2007
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 01/23/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 12/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 12/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 11/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 11/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 11/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less