This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/08/2016 at 02:37:46 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT V NUSSLOCK

Case Summary

On 04/28/2004 FORD MOTOR CREDIT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NUSSLOCK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2037

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY

Defendant

BRIAN H NUSSLOCK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REESE LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/08/2015

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/08/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11759749 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11583952.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11759749 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11583952.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 3/27/15) RECEIVED ON 03/19/2015.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 3/27/15) RECEIVED ON 03/19/2015.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/14/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/14/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/14/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/14/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11650090 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11474173.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11650090 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11474173.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/27/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/27/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/27/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/27/2014

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/27/2014

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/27/2014

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/27/2014

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/27/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 8/28/14) RECEIVED ON 08/27/2014.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 8/28/14) RECEIVED ON 08/27/2014.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/27/2014

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/27/2014

WRIT (OF EXECUTION) SUBMITTED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY REJECTED ON 05/10/2012.

WRIT (OF EXECUTION) SUBMITTED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY REJECTED ON 05/10/2012.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11127999 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10951891.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11127999 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10951891.

DECLARATION - OTHER (IN SUPPORT OF INTEREST) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/23/2012

DECLARATION - OTHER (IN SUPPORT OF INTEREST) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/23/2012

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/23/2012

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/23/2012

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF INTEREST) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 11/28/2011

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF INTEREST) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 11/28/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 11/28/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 11/28/2011

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/08/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11759749 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11583952.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 3/27/15) RECEIVED ON 03/19/2015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4347076 RECEIVED ON 03/19/2015 10:55:28 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/14/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/14/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4261109 RECEIVED ON 10/13/2014 09:37:55 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11650090 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11474173.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/27/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/27/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2011
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2004
  • DocketABSTRACT ISSUED ON 10/22/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2004
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT - LIMITED CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2004
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/05/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2004
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/04/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2004
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/04/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2004
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/04/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2004
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE (CERTIFICATE OF DUE DILIGENCE) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/05/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2004
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED TO SUMMONS) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/05/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2004
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 04/28/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant