This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 09:36:04 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY VS KABUA, VELMA

Case Summary

On 08/23/2001 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against KABUA, VELMA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5077

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2001

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY

Defendants

VELMA KABUA

ANTHONY KABUA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

REESE LAW GROUP, HARLAN M. REESE, ESQ

REESE LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/13/2010

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/13/2010

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF INTEREST & RENEWED JUDGMENT AMOUNT) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/13/2010

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF INTEREST & RENEWED JUDGMENT AMOUNT) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/13/2010

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF ADDRESS CHANGE AND CHANGE OF CORPORATE NAME) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/13/2010

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF ADDRESS CHANGE AND CHANGE OF CORPORATE NAME) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/13/2010

NOTICE - OTHER (OF FIRM NAME AND FIRM ADDRESS CHANGE.) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/13/2010

NOTICE - OTHER (OF FIRM NAME AND FIRM ADDRESS CHANGE.) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/13/2010

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/13/2010

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/13/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10522615.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10522615.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE), 141- CERTIFICATE FOR WHICH FEE NOT OTHERWISE FIXED (LIS PENDENS) IN THE AMOUNT OF 26.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10522646.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE), 141- CERTIFICATE FOR WHICH FEE NOT OTHERWISE FIXED (LIS PENDENS) IN THE AMOUNT OF 26.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10522646.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/11/2010

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/11/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE (NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/13/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE (NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/13/2010

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/20/2010

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/20/2010

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/20/2010

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/20/2010

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (& ADDRESS) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/20/2010

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (& ADDRESS) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/20/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10751713 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10575605.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10751713 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10575605.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 04/26/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 04/26/2011

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2012
  • DocketTRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketWRIT UPDATED ON 10/18/2010.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 04/26/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10751713 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10575605.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (& ADDRESS) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/20/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/20/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/20/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/13/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/11/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10522615.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/13/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (OF FIRM NAME AND FIRM ADDRESS CHANGE.) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/13/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (OF ADDRESS CHANGE AND CHANGE OF CORPORATE NAME) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/13/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (OF INTEREST & RENEWED JUDGMENT AMOUNT) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/13/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/13/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2002
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/25/2002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2002
  • DocketTHE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FOR FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY IN THE AMOUNT OF 3690.18 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST KABUA, VELMA .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2001
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/23/2001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2001
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant