This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/08/2016 at 06:20:15 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY VS. HENDRICKSON

Case Summary

On 05/18/2004 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HENDRICKSON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2336

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY

Defendants

GARY W HENDRICKSON

SANDRA G. WHITE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REESE LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 04/28/2016

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 04/28/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11868315 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11692508.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11868315 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11692508.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF INTEREST) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/14/2015

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF INTEREST) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/14/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/14/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/14/2015

WRIT (10/27/2015 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 10/14/2015.

WRIT (10/27/2015 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 10/14/2015.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/20/2015

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/20/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11764174 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11588397.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11764174 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11588397.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/27/2015

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/27/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/27/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/27/2015

WRIT (ISSUED 4/7/15) RECEIVED ON 03/27/2015.

WRIT (ISSUED 4/7/15) RECEIVED ON 03/27/2015.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/27/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/27/2015

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/27/2015

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/27/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11675760 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11499905.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11675760 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11499905.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 10-15-14) RECEIVED ON 10/14/2014.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 10-15-14) RECEIVED ON 10/14/2014.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/28/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/28/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/28/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/28/2014

LEGACY CASE PAGES

LEGACY CASE PAGES

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11648241 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11472330.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11648241 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11472330.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 04/28/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11868315 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11692508.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF INTEREST) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/14/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/14/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (10/27/2015 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 10/14/2015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2414739 RECEIVED ON 10/14/2015 08:46:32 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2004
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/18/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/20/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11764174 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11588397.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/27/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2004
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED ON 12/23/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2004
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 12/16/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2004
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST (MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMNT,ACK. OF CREDIT,DECL OF ACCRUED INTEREST) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 12/16/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2004
  • DocketABSTRACT ISSUED ON 10/08/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2004
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT - LIMITED CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2004
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/03/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2004
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/25/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2004
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/25/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2004
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/25/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2004
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 05/18/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant