This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/17/2016 at 06:05:33 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY V WEGNER

Case Summary

On 05/17/2006 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WEGNER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2153

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY

Defendants

HAROLD M WEGNER

GAIL L WEGNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REESE LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CO

REESE LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/19/2016

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/19/2016

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/04/2016

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/04/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/04/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/04/2016

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/04/2016

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/04/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11488318 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11312230.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11488318 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11312230.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/29/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/29/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/29/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/29/2013

WRIT (ISSUED 10/30/13) RECEIVED ON 10/29/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED 10/30/13) RECEIVED ON 10/29/2013.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/08/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/08/2011

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF INTEREST) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/12/2010

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF INTEREST) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/12/2010

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/12/2010

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/12/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10544281.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10544281.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (NOTICE OF FIRM NAME AND FIRM ADDRESS CHANGE) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/12/2010

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (NOTICE OF FIRM NAME AND FIRM ADDRESS CHANGE) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 08/12/2010

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1303236 RECEIVED ON 02/04/2016 10:38:02 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2006
  • JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4499405 RECEIVED ON 02/04/2016 09:02:44 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11488318 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11312230.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 07/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 07/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2006
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 07/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 07/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 07/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 06/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 06/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 05/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 05/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.