This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 08:49:02 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT CO V VENTIMIGLIA

Case Summary

On 08/02/2004 FORD MOTOR CREDIT CO filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against VENTIMIGLIA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3607

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendant

DAMON D VENTIMIGLIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REESE LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/21/2014

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/21/2014

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/21/2014

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/21/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/21/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/21/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/21/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/21/2014

LEGACY CASE PAGES

LEGACY CASE PAGES

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/28/2014

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/28/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 7/29/14) RECEIVED ON 07/28/2014.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 7/29/14) RECEIVED ON 07/28/2014.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/28/2014

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/28/2014

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/28/2014

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/28/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/28/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/28/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/28/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/28/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11633553 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11457616.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11633553 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11457616.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 08/14/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 08/14/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 08/14/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 08/14/2014

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 03/11/2015) RECEIVED ON 03/06/2015.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 03/11/2015) RECEIVED ON 03/06/2015.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11749781 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11573968.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11749781 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11573968.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11749781 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11573968.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 03/11/2015) RECEIVED ON 03/06/2015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4339736 RECEIVED ON 03/06/2015 12:13:37 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 08/14/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 08/14/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3178897 RECEIVED ON 08/14/2014 08:13:28 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11633553 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11457616.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/28/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/28/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 07/28/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2006
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED (WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 10/18/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2006
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED ON 04/18/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2006
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST (MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMNT,ACK. OF CREDIT,DECL OF ACCRUED INTEREST) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 04/17/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2006
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 04/17/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2004
  • DocketABSTRACT ISSUED ON 09/23/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2004
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 09/22/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2004
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (NTC OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT) WAS FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY A CORPORATION ON 09/22/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2004
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED) WAS FILED ON 08/03/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2004
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF APPLICATION AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2004
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 08/02/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant