This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/23/2016 at 04:55:50 (UTC).

FOOTHILL/EASTERN V KING

Case Summary

On 08/02/2006 FOOTHILL/EASTERN filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against KING. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3401

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRID

FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ

Defendants

DANIEL KING

TION KING

Interested Party

LIHN NGUYEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NOSSAMAN, GUTHNER, KNOX & ELLIOTT

MARIA MAHECHA

Defendant Attorney

REX L BRADY

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11695074 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11519371.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11695074 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11519371.

WRIT (ISSUED 11/20/2014) RECEIVED ON 11/05/2014.

WRIT (ISSUED 11/20/2014) RECEIVED ON 11/05/2014.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 11/05/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 11/05/2014

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ; FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 02/04/2013

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ; FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 02/04/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 07/19/2012

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 07/19/2012

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF 3RD PARTY 09/07/2011 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF 3RD PARTY 09/07/2011 08:30:00 AM.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (OJD AND SUPBOENA) FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 07/11/2011

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (OJD AND SUPBOENA) FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 07/11/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER (AND MEMO OF P&AS IN SUPPORT OF 3RD PARTY EXAMINATION) FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 05/31/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER (AND MEMO OF P&AS IN SUPPORT OF 3RD PARTY EXAMINATION) FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 05/31/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10921902 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10745794.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10921902 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10745794.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR THIRD PARTY EXAM FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 05/31/2011

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR THIRD PARTY EXAM FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 05/31/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 01/21/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 01/21/2011

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 07/30/2010

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 07/30/2010

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 08/28/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 08/28/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10511152.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10511152.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 02/06/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 02/06/2008

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11695074 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11519371.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 11/20/2014) RECEIVED ON 11/05/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 11/05/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3211609 RECEIVED ON 11/05/2014 11:22:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ; FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 02/04/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2198297 RECEIVED ON 02/04/2013 04:12:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 07/19/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF 3RD PARTY 09/07/2011 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF 3RD PARTY CONTINUED TO 10/05/2011 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2006
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR (ORDER FOR APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR) WAS FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 11/16/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2006
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR HEARD ON 11/16/2006 AT 08:30:00 IN HLH AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2006
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED ON 10/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2006
  • WRIT ISSUED ON 10/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST (MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMNT,ACK. OF CREDIT,DECL OF ACCRUED INTEREST) WAS FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 10/03/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY) WAS FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 10/03/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SENT) WAS FILED ON 08/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY CLERK- LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 08/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2006
  • PETITION - OTHER (PETITION OTHER) WAS FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY AND SAN JOAQ ON 08/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.