This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/28/2016 at 11:03:16 (UTC).

FOOTHILL V GARZA

Case Summary

On 01/19/2006 FOOTHILL filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against GARZA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0330

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRID

FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY

Defendant

JOE LEWIS GARZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

NOSSAMAN, GUTHNER, KNOX & ELLIOTT

REX L BRADY

JANET A. NICHOLSON

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 01/12/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 01/12/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11902797 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11727014.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11902797 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11727014.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 01/08/2016

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 01/08/2016

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 1/8/16) RECEIVED ON 01/08/2016.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 1/8/16) RECEIVED ON 01/08/2016.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 01/08/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 01/08/2016

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 01/08/2016

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 01/08/2016

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 02/04/2013

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 02/04/2013

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 07/30/2010

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 07/30/2010

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 04/30/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 04/30/2009

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 01/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1299091 RECEIVED ON 01/12/2016 09:33:09 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11902797 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11727014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 01/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 1/8/16) RECEIVED ON 01/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 01/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 01/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4486895 RECEIVED ON 01/08/2016 08:34:45 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 02/04/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2007
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 12/21/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2007
  • WRIT ISSUED ON 06/22/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2007
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST (MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMNT,ACK. OF CREDIT,DECL OF ACCRUED INTEREST) WAS FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 06/07/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED ON 05/03/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED ON 03/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2006
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY) WAS FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 03/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2006
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) WAS FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 02/08/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY CLERK- LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2006
  • PETITION - OTHER (PETITION OTHER) WAS FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 01/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 01/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less