This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/28/2016 at 11:01:35 (UTC).

FOOTHILL V AICHELE

Case Summary

On 01/19/2006 FOOTHILL filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against AICHELE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0333

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRID

FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY

Defendants

KENTON H AICHELE

RONALD HOUSEHOLDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

NOSSAMAN, GUTHNER, KNOX & ELLIOTT

JANET A. NICHOLSON

MARIA MAHECHA

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 09/14/2016

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 09/14/2016

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 12/17/15) FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 12/16/2015

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 12/17/15) FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 12/16/2015

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 12/16/2015

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 12/16/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 12/16/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 12/16/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 12/16/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 12/16/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11703740 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11528043.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11703740 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11528043.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF 3RD PARTY 10/16/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF 3RD PARTY 10/16/2014 09:00:00 AM.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 09/09/2014

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 09/09/2014

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR THIRD PARTY EXAM FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 08/11/2014

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR THIRD PARTY EXAM FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 08/11/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 02/28/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 02/28/2014

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 10/31/2012

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 10/31/2012

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 06/30/2010

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 06/30/2010

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 08/01/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 08/01/2008

ORDER - OTHER (SETTING ASIDE AND VACATING JUDGMENT) FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 05/15/2008

ORDER - OTHER (SETTING ASIDE AND VACATING JUDGMENT) FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 05/15/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT 05/15/2008 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT 05/15/2008 09:30:00 AM.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 04/04/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 04/04/2008

MOTION TO SET ASIDE FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 04/04/2008

MOTION TO SET ASIDE FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 04/04/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 01/08/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 01/08/2008

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 09/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2493588 RECEIVED ON 09/14/2016 04:36:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 12/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3363086 RECEIVED ON 12/21/2015 09:25:14 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 12/17/15) FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 12/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 12/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 12/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 12/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 12/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1295461 RECEIVED ON 12/16/2015 01:08:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2006
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR (ORDER FOR APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR) WAS FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 08/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2006
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED ON 07/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 07/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2006
  • WRIT ISSUED ON 06/29/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2006
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY) WAS FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 06/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2006
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST (MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMNT,ACK. OF CREDIT,DECL OF ACCRUED INTEREST) WAS FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 06/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2006
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) WAS FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 02/08/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY CLERK- LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2006
  • PETITION - OTHER (PETITION OTHER) WAS FILED BY FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 01/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 01/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRID is a litigant

Latest cases where FOOTHILL/EASTERN TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AND SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARIA MAHECHA