This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/02/2016 at 09:45:39 (UTC).

FIRST SELECT, INC. VS NHUNG THI THU PHAM

Case Summary

On 05/11/2001 FIRST SELECT, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NHUNG THI THU PHAM. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2668

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2001

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST SELECT, INC.

Defendant

NHUNG THI THU PHAM

Assignees

CREDIGY RECEIVABLES INC.

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHOENIX LAW GROUP, PC

Assignee Attorneys

JAMES R. GORMAN

CHRISTOPHER E WASSON

 

Court Documents

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIRST SELECT, INC. ON 10/09/2009

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIRST SELECT, INC. ON 10/09/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FIRST SELECT, INC. ON 06/13/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FIRST SELECT, INC. ON 06/13/2011

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FIRST SELECT, INC. ON 06/13/2011

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FIRST SELECT, INC. ON 06/13/2011

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIRST SELECT, INC. ON 06/30/2011

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIRST SELECT, INC. ON 06/30/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10942340 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10766232.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10942340 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10766232.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 1.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10942351 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10766243.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 1.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10942351 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10766243.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE), 141- CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 26.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10942354 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10766246.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE), 141- CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 26.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10942354 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10766246.

NOTICE - OTHER (CHANGE OF ATTORNEY) SUBMITTED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES INC. REJECTED ON 07/01/2011.

NOTICE - OTHER (CHANGE OF ATTORNEY) SUBMITTED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES INC. REJECTED ON 07/01/2011.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY FIRST SELECT, INC. ON 07/22/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY FIRST SELECT, INC. ON 07/22/2011

NOTICE - OTHER (CHANGE OF ATTORNEY) FILED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES INC. ON 08/02/2011

NOTICE - OTHER (CHANGE OF ATTORNEY) FILED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES INC. ON 08/02/2011

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE GROUP ON 10/31/2011

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE GROUP ON 10/31/2011

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2012
  • DocketTRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE GROUP ON 10/31/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (CHANGE OF ATTORNEY) FILED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES INC. ON 08/02/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY FIRST SELECT, INC. ON 07/22/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (CHANGE OF ATTORNEY) SUBMITTED BY CREDIGY RECEIVABLES INC. REJECTED ON 07/01/2011.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE), 141- CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 26.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10942354 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10766246.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 1.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10942351 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10766243.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10942340 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10766232.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIRST SELECT, INC. ON 06/30/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FIRST SELECT, INC. ON 06/13/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FIRST SELECT, INC. ON 06/13/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIRST SELECT, INC. ON 10/09/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2001
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2001
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2001
  • DocketTHE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FOR FIRST SELECT, INC. IN THE AMOUNT OF 3196.82 PRINCIPAL, 131.00 COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST PHAM, NHUNG THI THU .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2001
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED BY FIRST SELECT, INC. ON 07/05/2001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2001
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY FIRST SELECT, INC. ON 05/11/2001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2001
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREDIGY RECEIVABLES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where First Select, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE GROUP A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORMAN JAMES R. ESQ.