This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/06/2016 at 07:36:11 (UTC).

FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP. VS. ERICKSON

Case Summary

On 01/20/2004 FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against ERICKSON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0251

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP

Defendant

DEEANNA S. ERICKSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREWER & BREWER

 

Court Documents

WRIT SUBMITTED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP REJECTED ON 02/25/2013.

WRIT SUBMITTED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP REJECTED ON 02/25/2013.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 08/06/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 08/06/2013

WRIT (ISSUED, 9/13/2013) RECEIVED ON 08/06/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED, 9/13/2013) RECEIVED ON 08/06/2013.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11456553 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11280445.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11456553 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11280445.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 02/03/2014

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 02/03/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 02/03/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 02/03/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 2/4/14) RECEIVED ON 02/03/2014.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 2/4/14) RECEIVED ON 02/03/2014.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11538259 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11362104.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11538259 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11362104.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 02/04/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 02/04/2014

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 02/04/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4140834 RECEIVED ON 02/04/2014 11:52:44 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11538259 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11362104.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 2/4/14) RECEIVED ON 02/03/2014.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 02/03/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 02/03/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2306547 RECEIVED ON 02/03/2014 09:55:45 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2004
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 09/01/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11456553 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11280445.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (ISSUED, 9/13/2013) RECEIVED ON 08/06/2013.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 08/06/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2269056 RECEIVED ON 08/06/2013 09:44:18 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT SUBMITTED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP REJECTED ON 02/25/2013.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • DocketTHE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FOR FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP IN THE AMOUNT OF 4827.98 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST ERICKSON, DEEANNA S. .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 01/20/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP is a litigant