This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/12/2016 at 09:30:39 (UTC).

FIRESIDE VS YANAGI

Case Summary

On 02/07/2006 FIRESIDE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against YANAGI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0655

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRESIDE BANK

Defendant

KATHRYN M YANAGI

Assignee

CALVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

POLK PROBER AND RAPHAEL A LAW CORPORAT

VIDHYA G IYER

WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Defendant Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORAT

Assignee Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12008715 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11832800.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12008715 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11832800.

WRIT (ISSUED 8/2/16) RECEIVED ON 07/29/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 8/2/16) RECEIVED ON 07/29/2016.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CALVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 07/29/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CALVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 07/29/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CALVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 06/20/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CALVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 06/20/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 04/29/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 04/29/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11931951 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11756136.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11931951 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11756136.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 3/7/16) RECEIVED ON 03/07/2016.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 3/7/16) RECEIVED ON 03/07/2016.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CALVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/07/2016

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CALVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/07/2016

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 09/05/2014

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 09/05/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11350995 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11174887.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11350995 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11174887.

WRIT RECEIVED ON 03/22/2013.

WRIT RECEIVED ON 03/22/2013.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 04/11/2013

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 04/11/2013

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT AND NOTICE OF NEW ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JUDGMENT ASSIGNEE, CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC) FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 07/19/2012

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT AND NOTICE OF NEW ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JUDGMENT ASSIGNEE, CAVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC) FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 07/19/2012

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 07/19/2012

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 07/19/2012

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 11/07/2011

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 11/07/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11019624 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10843516.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11019624 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10843516.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY SUBMITTED BY FIRESIDE BANK REJECTED ON 10/28/2011.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY SUBMITTED BY FIRESIDE BANK REJECTED ON 10/28/2011.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 04/13/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 04/13/2009

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12008715 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11832800.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 8/2/16) RECEIVED ON 07/29/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CALVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 07/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1335334 RECEIVED ON 07/29/2016 03:52:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CALVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 06/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2471885 RECEIVED ON 06/20/2016 03:00:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 04/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2459187 RECEIVED ON 04/29/2016 03:53:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CALVALRY INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3391668 RECEIVED ON 03/16/2016 09:50:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 04/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 04/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2006
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/O PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 04/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 04/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 03/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2006
  • DOCUMENT - OTHER (SPECIAL FILING SEE REMARKS) WAS FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 02/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 02/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY FIRESIDE BANK ON 02/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 02/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less